This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/04/2022 at 07:37:51 (UTC).

PHYSICIANS HEALTH INC.,PULEO, ANGELO vs FARMERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 PHYSICIANS HEALTH INC ,PULEO, ANGELO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FARMERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, James. S and Giardina, S. James. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3381

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, James. S

Giardina, S. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PHYSICIANS HEALTH INC. D/B/A RIVAS MEDICAL CENTERS

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

PHYSICIANS HEALTH INC.

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

PULEO, ANGELO

RIVAS MEDICAL CENTERS

Defendant

FARMERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a

200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN , PHILIP ALAN

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

Friedman Law Associates, P.L. 2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorneys

VENEGAS , ASHLEY MARIE

Attorney at LAW OFCS. OF RYAN, ACOSTA FARMER & MARSH

Empls. Of Farmers Ins. Exchange Po Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125

URQUIZA , CRYSTAL

Attorney at LAW OFCS. OF RYAN, ACOSTA FARMER & MARSH

Empls. Of Farmers Ins Exchange Po Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/26/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

07/06/2022: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

07/06/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

07/06/2022: NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

07/06/2022: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

MOTION TO COMPEL

06/27/2022: MOTION TO COMPEL

EXHIBIT

06/27/2022: EXHIBIT

MOTION TO STRIKE

06/09/2022: MOTION TO STRIKE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

05/31/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

05/20/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/05/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/05/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/05/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY

04/28/2022: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/25/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/11/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

04/11/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/11/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022369281; Judge: Giardina, James S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PHYSICIANS HEALTH INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME; Additional Info: Defendant: FARMERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: FARMERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: FARMERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: FARMERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL; Comment: ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES AND PRODUCTION DOCUMENTS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PHYSICIANS HEALTH INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PHYSICIANS HEALTH INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PHYSICIANS HEALTH INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PHYSICIANS HEALTH INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PHYSICIANS HEALTH INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PHYSICIANS HEALTH INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PHYSICIANS HEALTH INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PHYSICIANS HEALTH INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PHYSICIANS HEALTH INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PHYSICIANS HEALTH INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: FARMERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FARMERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a is a litigant

Latest cases where Physicians Health, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where RIVAS MEDICAL CENTERS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip Friedman