This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 04/22/2022 at 22:26:53 (UTC).

Physicians Group, LLC,Creed, Christina vs Progressive Select Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 Physicians Group, LLC,Creed, Christina filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Progressive Select Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C and Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2582

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Creed, Christina

Physicians Group, LLC

111 2Nd Ave Ne Suite 630

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

Defendant

Progressive Select Insurance Company

C/O Fla Cfo 200 E. Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETTY , C SPENCER

Attorney at IRVIN & PETTY, P.A.

111 2Nd Ave Ne Ste 630

St Petersburg, FL 33701

Defendant Attorney

LOVE-LANE , RHAMEN MALIQUE

Attorney at ANDREWS BIERNACKI DAVIS

390 N Orange Ave Ste 2100

Orlando, FL 32801-1642

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/14/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/14/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

INTERROGATORIES

01/14/2022: INTERROGATORIES

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/14/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CORRESPONDENCE

01/14/2022: CORRESPONDENCE

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/14/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/14/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/14/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/14/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

MOTION TO COMPEL

03/09/2022: MOTION TO COMPEL

PRIVILEGE LOG

03/03/2022: PRIVILEGE LOG

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/03/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

03/03/2022: ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

03/02/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/08/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/08/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/08/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/31/2022: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL; Comment: BETTER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketREQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Physicians Group, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Physicians Group, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Physicians Group, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Physicians Group, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Physicians Group, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Physicians Group, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Physicians Group, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Love-Lane, Rhamen M