This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 01/12/2022 at 01:42:02 (UTC).

Physicians Group, LLC,SOLOMON, BERNICE vs Property & Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 Physicians Group, LLC,SOLOMON, BERNICE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Property Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam and Valkenburg, Miriam. V.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0151

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Physicians Group, LLC

111 2Nd Ave Ne Suite 630

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

SOLOMON, BERNICE

Defendant

Property & Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford

C/O Fla. Cfo 200 E. Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETTY , C SPENCER

Attorney at IRVIN & PETTY, P.A.

111 2Nd Ave Ne Ste 630

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/04/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

11/06/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

11/06/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CORRESPONDENCE

11/04/2021: CORRESPONDENCE

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/04/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

INTERROGATORIES

11/04/2021: INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/04/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/04/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

11/04/2021: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

11/13/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

12/13/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021656926

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Property & Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Physicians Group, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Physicians Group, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Physicians Group, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Physicians Group, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Physicians Group, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Physicians Group, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Physicians Group, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Physicians Group, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartfor is a litigant