This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 08/21/2019 at 10:04:16 (UTC).

PHILLIPS,ROJAE VS BROWN,LADAISHA

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 PHILLIPS,ROJAE filed a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BROWN,LADAISHA. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Perrone, Frances M and Perrone, M. Frances. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0171

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Perrone, Frances M

Perrone, M. Frances

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PHILLIPS, ROJAE

Tampa, FL 33617

Respondents

BROWN, LADAISHA

Tampa, FL 33610

BROWN, LADAISHA ZAIRE

Tampa, FL 33610

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

KHOUDMI , YUSUF ALI

Attorney at THE SPRING OF TAMPA BAY

Po Box 5147

Tampa, FL 33675

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2019
  • NOTICE; Comment: OF TERMINATION OF LIMITED APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • FILE RECEIVED AT RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • COURT DOCKET PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Respondent: BROWN, LADAISHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL (FAMILY); Comment: PETITIONER FTA; Additional Info: Petitioner: PHILLIPS, ROJAE; Respondent: BROWN, LADAISHA; Date Signed: 01/15/2019; Judicial Officer: Perrone, Frances M; Vol./Book: 26359, Page: 1429, Number of Pages: 1429

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • NOTICE OF CURRENT ADDRESS; Additional Info: Respondent: BROWN, LADAISHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: (LIMITED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • MOTION TO - FOR; Comment: FOR ATTENDANCE AND TESTIMONY OF A MINOR CHILD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: ORDER, UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT, PETITION, ORDER SETTING HEARING, NOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Additional Info: Respondent: BROWN, LADAISHA; Date Served: 01/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2019
  • DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INTAKE FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • FILE HOME LOCATION IS TAMPA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • PETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • SRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • STAY AWAY FROM; Comment: 9911 WEXFORD DR 33610;7450 E HILLSBOROUGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • PETITIONER COPY COVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • ORDER SETTING HEARING; Comment: Based on the facts stated in your petition, the court has set a hearing to take testimony and make a ruling on the petition. The hearing date is available at HOVER.hillsclerk.com on the Hearings tab of the case. A supplemental petition with additiona; Additional Info: Petitioner: PHILLIPS, ROJAE; Respondent: BROWN, LADAISHA; Date 2: 01/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • EMAIL SENT TO HCSO CIVIL PROCESSING UNIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Order Setting Hearing; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 302 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Perrone, Frances M

    Read MoreRead Less