This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 04/14/2020 at 16:23:36 (UTC).

Pettys, Jennifer R. vs Pettys, Richard L, Jr

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 Pettys, Jennifer R filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Pettys, Richard L, Jr. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Plant City Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Lefler, Lawrence, Tibbals, D.. Wesley and Tibbals, Wesley D.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0797

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Plant City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Lefler, Lawrence

Tibbals, D.. Wesley

Tibbals, Wesley D.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Pettys, Jennifer R.

Lakeland, FL 33809

Respondent

Pettys, Richard L, Jr

Plant City, FL 33565

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRUSH , ROBERT MICHAEL

Attorney at BRUSH & COYLE, P.A.

825 E Main St

Lakeland, FL 33801

Respondent Attorney

SCAGLIONE , PETER, Jr

2127 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd

Tampa, FL 33607

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT CONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Additional Info: Petitioner: Pettys, Jennifer R.; Respondent: Pettys, Richard L, Jr; Signed: 08/19/2019; Judicial Officer: Tibbals, Wesley D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ATTACHED MEDIATED MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND PARENTING PLAN; Additional Info: Respondent: Pettys, Richard L, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketOUTCOME OF FAMILY MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: ATTORNEY TO PREPARE WRITTEN MEDIATED AGREEMENT; Additional Info: Private Attorney: SCAGLIONE , PETER, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: NOT ATTACHED; Additional Info: Respondent: Pettys, Richard L, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF PARENTING CLASS COMPLETED; Additional Info: Respondent: Pettys, Richard L, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketANSWER TO COUNTER-PETITION; Additional Info: Petitioner: Pettys, Jennifer R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY; Additional Info: Petitioner: Pettys, Jennifer R.; Private Attorney: BRUSH , ROBERT MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT ORDERED MEDIATION; Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketE-FILED COUNTER PETITION $295; Comment: FOR DOM WITH MINOR CHILDREN AND OTHER RELIEF; Additional Info: Respondent: Pettys, Richard L, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketSRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Child 1: Pettys, Christine R; Petitioner: Pettys, Jennifer R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Additional Info: Child 1: Pettys, Christine R; Petitioner: Pettys, Jennifer R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Child 1: Pettys, Christine R; Petitioner: Pettys, Jennifer R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Child 1: Pettys, Christine R; Petitioner: Pettys, Jennifer R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketPETITION FILED; Additional Info: Child 1: Pettys, Christine R; Petitioner: Pettys, Jennifer R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketSummons (Initial Case Filing); Additional Info: Child 1: Pettys, Christine R; Petitioner: Pettys, Jennifer R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketDH513 FORM; Additional Info: Child 1: Pettys, Christine R; Petitioner: Pettys, Jennifer R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less