This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 04/02/2020 at 16:27:42 (UTC).

PEREZ, YANDRY vs UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 PEREZ, YANDRY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Battles, L. Emmett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0612

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Battles, L. Emmett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEREZ, YANDRY

Tampa, FL 33015

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PEREZ , NELSON ALEJANDRO

Attorney at HL LAW GROUP, P.A.

1001 N Federal Hwy Ste 246

Hallandale Beach, FL 33009

Defendant Attorneys

JAFFE , ANDREW BERNARD

Attorney at MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN GOGGIN

1110 W Commercial Blvd

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

FENCIK , GREGORY ALLEN

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF GREGORY A FENCIK, P.A.

1855 W State Road 434 Ste 282

Longwood, FL 32750

CHESTER , JEFFREY EDWIN

Attorney at MR. JEFFREY EDWIN CHESTER

Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Co. West State Road 434

Longwood, FL 32750

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

03/11/2019: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/06/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/26/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO COMPEL

04/14/2019: MOTION TO COMPEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/14/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/01/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/12/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/14/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/18/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/17/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/17/2019: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/17/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

INTERROGATORIES

01/17/2019: INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/17/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST

01/17/2019: REQUEST

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/17/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PEREZ, YANDRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: - OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM. JUSTIN PARSINO. 3/20/2020 @ 1030AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketSUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED; Comment: JUSTIN PARSINO 12/3/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Comment: 03/20/20 AT 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketSUBPOENA - DUCES TECUM; Comment: JUSTIN PARSINO, ON 03/20/20 AT 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketSUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1 - Nelson@goldlitigation.com ; ira@goldlitigation.com ; nelsonaperez@gmail.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PEREZ, YANDRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PEREZ, YANDRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PEREZ, YANDRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PEREZ, YANDRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PEREZ, YANDRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketREQUEST; Comment: PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITON PRIORITY REQUEST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PEREZ, YANDRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PEREZ, YANDRY

    Read MoreRead Less