This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/28/2022 at 02:27:23 (UTC).

People's Trust Insurance Company a/s/o Frances Aldana vs Emerson Electric Co.

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 People's Trust Insurance Company a/s/o Frances Aldana filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Emerson Electric Co. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Nash, Christopher C., Nash, Christopher. C. and Nash, C.. Christopher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2390

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Nash, Christopher C.

Nash, C.. Christopher

Nash, Christopher. C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Peoples Trust Insurance Co aso Frances Aldana

18 People'S Trust Way

Deerfield Beach, FL 33441

People's Trust Insurance Company a/s/o Frances Aldana

18 People'S Trust Way

Deerfield Beach, FL 33441

Defendants

Emerson Electric Co

8000 W Florissant Ave

St. Louis, MO 63136

Emerson Electric Co.

8000 W Florissant Ave

St. Louis, MO 63136

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BABCOCK , MARK THOMAS

Attorney at PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY

18 Peoples Trust Way

Deerfield Beach, FL 33441

Defendant Attorney

RICHMAN , SCOTT ALAN

Attorney at MCDONALD TOOLE WIGGINS P A

111 N Magnolia Ave Ste 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

AGREED ORDER

06/27/2022: AGREED ORDER

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

06/15/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

06/15/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

05/26/2022: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/26/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

05/25/2022: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/23/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

05/17/2022: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/16/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO DISMISS

05/12/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/12/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

Extended Differentiated Case Management Order

03/23/2022: Extended Differentiated Case Management Order

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

03/23/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/23/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/22/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/22/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

03/22/2022: COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

03/22/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: VIRTUAL COURT DATE - HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/4812642204 MEETING ID: 481 264 2204 Judicial Officer: Nash, Christopher C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Comment: ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO STAY DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS **GRANTED** 06/27/22 CCN; Additional Info: Defendant: Emerson Electric Co.; Date Signed: 06/27/2022; Judicial Officer: Nash, Christopher C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF HEARING - 6/15/22 AT 9:30AM; Additional Info: Defendant: Emerson Electric Co.; Private Attorney: RICHMAN , SCOTT ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF DEPOSITION - 7/27/22 AT 11:00AM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: People's Trust Insurance Company a/s/o Frances Aldana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: People's Trust Insurance Company a/s/o Frances Aldana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: 6/15/2022 AT 9:30 AM VIA ZOOM; Additional Info: Private Attorney: RICHMAN , SCOTT ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Additional Info: Defendant: Emerson Electric Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: People's Trust Insurance Company a/s/o Frances Aldana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 04/25/2022 DEFT EMERSON ELECTRIC CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: JUNE 15, 2022 @ 9:30AM- VIA ZOOM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: People's Trust Insurance Company a/s/o Frances Aldana

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: People's Trust Insurance Company a/s/o Frances Aldana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExtended Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: Emerson Electric Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketExtended Differentiated Case Management Applies; Comment: WAITING FOR HEARING DATES AVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Defendant: Emerson Electric Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Defendant: Emerson Electric Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Emerson Electric Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Emerson Electric Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: Emerson Electric Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Peoples Trust Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Emerson Electric Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Babcock, Mark