This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/25/2023 at 04:08:25 (UTC).

PeopleGuruCannibiz, Inc. vs Eaze Technologies, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/05/2022 PeopleGuruCannibiz, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Eaze Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Farfante, D. Darren, Tesche Arkin, Caroline and Farfante, Darren. D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8376

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Farfante, D. Darren

Tesche Arkin, Caroline

Farfante, Darren. D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PeopleGuruCannibiz, Inc.

Counter Plaintiff and Defendant

Eaze Technologies, Inc.

Counter Defendant

PEOPLEGURU CANNABIZ, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAAS , LEE LAMONT

Defendant Attorney

MANGAN , ALLISON JANE

Counter Plaintiff Attorney

PALERMO , ANTHONY JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/12/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

05/12/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

AGREED ORDER

05/01/2023: AGREED ORDER

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/28/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

04/28/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/30/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/29/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/29/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/29/2023: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

STIPULATED ORDER

03/24/2023: STIPULATED ORDER

JOINT STIPULATION

03/21/2023: JOINT STIPULATION

NOTICE TO SET FOR TRIAL

12/30/2022: NOTICE TO SET FOR TRIAL

ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM

12/05/2022: ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM

E-FILED COUNTERCLAIM - $395 FEE ASSESSED

11/15/2022: E-FILED COUNTERCLAIM - $395 FEE ASSESSED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/15/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

10/18/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/07/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

10/07/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Counter-Plaintiff: EAZE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.; Defendant: Eaze Technologies, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Counter-Plaintiff: EAZE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.; Defendant: Eaze Technologies, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Comment: GRANTING DEFENDANT/COUNTER-PLAINTIFF EAZE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Counter-Plaintiff: EAZE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.; Defendant: Eaze Technologies, Inc.; Date Signed: 05/01/2023; Judicial Officer:: Farfante, Darren D;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Eaze Technologies, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PeopleGuruCannibiz, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PeopleGuruCannibiz, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PeopleGuruCannibiz, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PeopleGuruCannibiz, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATED ORDER; Comment: GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY PLAINTIFF; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PeopleGuruCannibiz, Inc.; Date Signed: 03/24/2023; Judicial Officer:: Farfante, Darren D;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Eaze Technologies, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: DEFT: EAZE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.- INCORPORATING SERVICES, LTD.- 10/14/2022; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PeopleGuruCannibiz, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PeopleGuruCannibiz, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: Eaze Technologies, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies; Comment: CASE TRANSFERRED TO DIV. L NO ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PeopleGuruCannibiz, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PeopleGuruCannibiz, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PeopleGuruCannibiz, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PeopleGuruCannibiz, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less