This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 06/26/2022 at 01:41:53 (UTC).

Pennymac Loan Services, LLC vs Lonker, Ricky

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 Pennymac Loan Services, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Lonker, Ricky. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4025

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pennymac Loan Services Llc

225 Robinson Street Suite 660

Orlando, FL 32812

Pennymac Loan Services, LLC

225 Robinson Street Suite 660

Orlando, FL 32812

Defendants

Copper RidgeBrandon Homeowners Association Inc

202 S Rome Ave Suite 125

Tampa, FL 33606

Hillsborough County A Political Subdivision Of The

Tampa, FL 33602

Lonker, Ricky

Valrico, FL 33594

Midland Funding Llc

C/O Midland Credit Management, Inc. 13008 Telecom Drive, Suite 350

Tampa, FL 33637

Unknown Spouse Of Ricky Lonker

Valrico, FL 33594

Unknown Tenant In Possession 1

Valrico, FL 33594

Unknown Tenant In Possession 2

Valrico, FL 33594

Copper Ridge/Brandon Homeowners' Association, Inc.

C/O Nathan Frazier 202 S Rome Ave Suite 125

Tampa, FL 33606

Hillsborough County, A Political Subdivision Of The State of Florida

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS , SARA BETH

Attorney at MCCALLA RAYMER LEIBERT PIERCE LLC

225 E Robinson St Ste 155

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorney

GROSSMAN , GREGORY SAGOR

Attorney at FRAZIER AND BOWLES

202 S Rome Ave Ste 125

Tampa, FL 33606

 

Court Documents

LIS PENDENS

05/13/2022: LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT

05/13/2022: COMPLAINT

VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

05/13/2022: VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/02/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

CONSENT

05/23/2022: CONSENT

Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

05/16/2022: Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

05/16/2022: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/16/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/16/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/16/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/16/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/16/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/16/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/16/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/13/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

05/13/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/13/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/13/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Copper Ridge/Brandon Homeowners' Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT; Comment: TO FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE; Additional Info: Defendant: Hillsborough County, A Political Subdivision Of The State of Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCLERK DETERMINATION PER FRGP JA 2.420(d)(2)(B) - 2.423; Comment: E-FILED FILING # 149718513

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Additional Info: Defendant: Copper Ridge/Brandon Homeowners' Association, Inc.; Defendant: Hillsborough County, A Political Subdivision Of The State of Florida; Defendant: Lonker, Ricky; Defendant: Midland Funding LLC; Defendant: Unknown Spouse Of Ricky Lonker; Defendant: Unknown Tenant In Possession 1; Defendant: Unknown Tenant In Possession 2; Plaintiff: Pennymac Loan Services, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X7; Additional Info: Defendant: Copper Ridge/Brandon Homeowners' Association, Inc.; Defendant: Hillsborough County, A Political Subdivision Of The State of Florida; Defendant: Lonker, Ricky; Defendant: Midland Funding LLC; Defendant: Unknown Spouse Of Ricky Lonker; Defendant: Unknown Tenant In Possession 1; Defendant: Unknown Tenant In Possession 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X7

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pennymac Loan Services, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pennymac Loan Services, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pennymac Loan Services, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pennymac Loan Services, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pennymac Loan Services, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pennymac Loan Services, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pennymac Loan Services, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pennymac Loan Services, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pennymac Loan Services, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pennymac Loan Services, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Copper Ridge/Brandon Homeowner`s Association, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where PennyMac Loan Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARA B COLLINS, ESQ