Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 04/23/2021 at 08:09:52 (UTC).

PELHAM, MARY ELIZABETH - Estate

Case Summary

On 03/12/2020 PELHAM, MARY ELIZABETH - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Corvo, T. Vivian and Corvo, Vivian. T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0790

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Corvo, T. Vivian

Corvo, Vivian. T

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court, Claimants and Petitioners

Coble, Cheryl Ann

Seffner, FL 33584

CAPITAL ONE NA

Capital One Walmart Rewards Card 7601 Penn Ave S, Ste A650

Minneapolis, MN 55423

BRANDON REGIONAL HOSPITAL

C/O Probate Recovery Systems, Llc P.O. Box 40

Largo, FL 33779

SOUTH BAY HOSPITAL

C/O Probate Recovery Systems, Llc P.O. Box 40

Largo, FL 33779

TAMPA BAY RADIATION ONCOLOGY, PA

Sun City Center, FL 33573

AMERICAN AMBULANCE

C/O Grant Mercantile Agency Po Box 658

Oakhurst, CA 93644

ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES, LLC

O/B/O Synchrony Bank -Sam'S Club Personal Credit 200 Coon Rapids Blvd, Suite 200

Coon Rapids, MN 55433-5876

BAY AREA CARDIOLOGY ASSOCIATES

635 Eichenfeld Drive

Brandon, FL 33511

HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE CO

Decedent

PELHAM, MARY ELIZABETH

Rierview, FL 33511

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court, Claimant and Petitioner Attorneys

FALLER , DANIELLE RACHELLE

Attorney at HEMNESS FALLER ELDER LAW

309 N Parsons Ave

Brandon, FL 33510

GAO , YING

Attorney at HEMNESS FALLER ELDER LAW

309 N Parsons Ave

Brandon, FL 33510

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketJOINDER,WAIVER AND CONSENT; Comment: ISAAC J WILLIAMS; Additional Info: Petitioning Attorney: FALLER , DANIELLE RACHELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketJOINDER,WAIVER AND CONSENT; Comment: ROSETTA MAY ANTHONY; Additional Info: Petitioning Attorney: FALLER , DANIELLE RACHELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketJOINDER,WAIVER AND CONSENT; Comment: ELLEN MARIE DREYER; Additional Info: Petitioning Attorney: FALLER , DANIELLE RACHELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketJOINDER,WAIVER AND CONSENT; Comment: RAFAEL ALBARRAN; Additional Info: Petitioning Attorney: FALLER , DANIELLE RACHELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketJOINDER,WAIVER AND CONSENT; Comment: MANUEL E ALBARRAN; Additional Info: Petitioning Attorney: FALLER , DANIELLE RACHELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketJOINDER,WAIVER AND CONSENT; Comment: LISA ANN CONSELATORE; Additional Info: Petitioning Attorney: FALLER , DANIELLE RACHELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Claimant: COBLE, CHERYL ANN; Personal Representative: COBLE, CHERYL ANN; Petitioner: COBLE, CHERYL ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Claimant: COBLE, CHERYL ANN; Personal Representative: COBLE, CHERYL ANN; Petitioner: COBLE, CHERYL ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SRVC NOTICE OF ADMIN; Additional Info: Claimant: COBLE, CHERYL ANN; Personal Representative: COBLE, CHERYL ANN; Petitioner: COBLE, CHERYL ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketWAIVER; Comment: ALVIE L DAVIDSON - OF SRVC AND ACCEPTANCE OF SUBP FOR HEARING; Additional Info: Claimant: COBLE, CHERYL ANN; Personal Representative: COBLE, CHERYL ANN; Petitioner: COBLE, CHERYL ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: OF DILIGENT SEARCH; Additional Info: Petitioning Attorney: FALLER , DANIELLE RACHELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: OF DILIGENT SEARCH; Additional Info: Petitioning Attorney: FALLER , DANIELLE RACHELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Comment: ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Additional Info: Claimant: COBLE, CHERYL ANN; Personal Representative: COBLE, CHERYL ANN; Petitioner: COBLE, CHERYL ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: 03/12/20; Additional Info: Petitioning Attorney: FALLER , DANIELLE RACHELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Claimant: COBLE, CHERYL ANN; Personal Representative: COBLE, CHERYL ANN; Petitioner: COBLE, CHERYL ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketPET FOR ADMIN-FLA RES W-O WILL; Additional Info: Claimant: COBLE, CHERYL ANN; Personal Representative: COBLE, CHERYL ANN; Petitioner: COBLE, CHERYL ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Claimant: COBLE, CHERYL ANN; Personal Representative: COBLE, CHERYL ANN; Petitioner: COBLE, CHERYL ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN AMBULANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where BAY AREA CARDIOLOGY ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTH BAY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where BRANDON REGIONAL HOSPITAL is a litigant