This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/26/2019 at 12:35:39 (UTC).

PEARCE TIMBER LLC vs CAPITAL PARTNERS NETWORK OT INC

Case Summary

On 08/07/2017 PEARCE TIMBER LLC filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against CAPITAL PARTNERS NETWORK OT INC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Moore. Laurel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7412

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Moore. Laurel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PEARCE TIMBER LLC

700 D Lot 1 Grand Bay-Wilmer Road N

Mobile, AL 36608

PEARCE, WILLIAM

Defendants

RICHMOND CAPITAL GROUP LLC

JOHN DOE #1 INC

JOHN DOE #1

CAPITAL PARTNERS NETWORK OT INC

8019 N Himes Avenue Suite 310

Tampa, FL 33614

JOHN DOE #5 INC

JOHN DOE #2 INC

JOHN DOE #3 INC

JOHN DOE #4 INC

BRAUN, JONATHAN

GREENBOX CAPITAL LLC

Intervenor

Georgia Pacific WFS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LISS , MICHAEL JAY

Attorney at INTEGRITY COUNSEL, P.A.

150 E Palmetto Park Rd Ste 350

Boca Raton, FL 33432

HALSTEAD , TRAVIS JAY

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON BEARMAN CALDWELL & BERKOW

200 S Orange Ave Ste 2900

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorney

TRAUB , SETH P

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 2800

Tampa, FL 33602

Intervenor Attorney

PALERMO , ANTHONY JOSEPH

100 N Tampa St Ste 4100

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT

11/22/2017: EXHIBIT

LETTER TO

10/20/2017: LETTER TO

NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING

12/05/2017: NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING

COMPLAINT

08/07/2017: COMPLAINT

EXHIBIT

11/22/2017: EXHIBIT

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/01/2017: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

08/07/2017: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/18/2017: AMENDED COMPLAINT

MOTION TO DISMISS

08/31/2017: MOTION TO DISMISS

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: 3/25/19 @ 10:45 AM; DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR COSTS AND ATTORNEYS' FEES; Additional Info: Defendant: CAPITAL PARTNERS NETWORK OT INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES; Comment: DEFENDANT S; Additional Info: Defendant: CAPITAL PARTNERS NETWORK OT INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION; Comment: OF NON-PARTY (INTERNATIONAL PAPER CO) TO INTERVENE & TO INTERPLEAD DISPUTED FUNDS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PEARCE TIMBER LLC; Plaintiff: PEARCE, WILLIAM; Date 2: 06/22/2018; Judicial Officer: Lee, Laurel Moore

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ITS AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT 1; Additional Info: Defendant: GREENBOX CAPITAL LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: DFDT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Comment: PF 2nd & 6TH CAUSE OF ACTION W/O PREJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: AMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: GREENBOX CAPITAL LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: DFDT'S SECOND - TO ANSWER AMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: GREENBOX CAPITAL LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: CAPITAL PARTNERS NETWORK OT, INC , ON 08/10/17 AT 10:25 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1 - info@mikelisslawyer.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: CAPITAL PARTNERS NETWORK OT INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Code: ODISM; Judgment Description: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2018417655; Judge: Lee, Laurel Moore

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Code: NDISM; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2018089023; Judge: Lee, Laurel Moore

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREENBOX CAPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PALERMO , ANTHONY JOSEPH