This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/15/2019 at 08:52:27 (UTC).

PAYNE, MOLLY vs O'BRIEN, DESTINY DELTA

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 PAYNE, MOLLY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against O'BRIEN, DESTINY DELTA. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Plant City Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Campbell, D.. Lisa, Lefler, Lawrence and Tibbals, D. Wesley. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0330

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Plant City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Campbell, D.. Lisa

Lefler, Lawrence

Tibbals, D. Wesley

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PAYNE, MOLLY

Zephyrhills, FL 33541

Respondent

O'BRIEN, DESTINY DELTA

Zephyrhills, FL 33541

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2019
  • RETURNED MAIL; Additional Info: Petitioner: PAYNE, MOLLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • COPY OF; Comment: CERTIFICATION OF BIRTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • COPY OF; Comment: CERTIFICATION OF BIRTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT NON CONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Additional Info: Petitioner: PAYNE, MOLLY; Respondent: O'BRIEN, DESTINY DELTA; Signed: 04/24/2019; Judicial Officer: Tibbals, Wesley D; Vol./Book: 26577, Page: 1667, Number of Pages: 1667

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT (FAMILY); Additional Info: Petitioner: PAYNE, MOLLY; Respondent: O'BRIEN, DESTINY DELTA; Date Signed: 04/24/2019; Judicial Officer: Tibbals, Wesley D; Vol./Book: 26578, Page: 68, Number of Pages: 68

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING WITHOUT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Additional Info: Date Signed: 04/22/2019; Judicial Officer: Tibbals, Wesley D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • ORDER SETTING HEARING; Comment: FINAL W/O PRETRIAL; Additional Info: Date 2: 02/26/2019; Judicial Officer: Tibbals, Wesley D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • PARENTING PLAN; Additional Info: Petitioner: PAYNE, MOLLY; Respondent: O'BRIEN, DESTINY DELTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Comment: CHILD SUPPORT GUIIDELINES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2019
  • COPY OF IDENTIFICATION; Comment: DL OF PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Comment: OF PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Comment: PETITIONER'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF MANDATORY DISCLOSURE; Comment: PETITIONER'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Comment: OF RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Comment: RESPONDENT'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF MANDATORY DISCLOSURE; Comment: RESPONDENT'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DH513 FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less