This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/20/2023 at 00:43:59 (UTC).

Parkwood Homeowners Association of Walden Lake Inc vs Brito, Howard

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 Parkwood Homeowners Association of Walden Lake Inc filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Brito, Howard. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Makholm, S. Marc and Makholm, Marc. S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8046

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Makholm, S. Marc

Makholm, Marc. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Parkwood Homeowners Association of Walden Lake Inc

Defendant

Brito, Howard

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

APPLETON , ERIC NEWELL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

12/06/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

11/14/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

11/14/2022: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/10/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

LIS PENDENS

11/10/2022: LIS PENDENS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/10/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/10/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

03/01/2023: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES

03/01/2023: AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

09/20/2023: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF JUDICIAL SALE

07/19/2023: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF JUDICIAL SALE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE

06/30/2023: PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SALE

06/14/2023: NOTICE OF SALE

FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

06/13/2023: FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

COURT TICKET

06/12/2023: COURT TICKET

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/26/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING

JUDGE'S COPIES OF PLEADINGS

05/24/2023: JUDGE'S COPIES OF PLEADINGS

DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

05/22/2023: DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Parkwood Homeowners Association of Walden Lake Inc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

HearingMORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SALE; Cancelled Comments: Request of the Party ATTY; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Judicial Officer: Judge, Presiding

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketJUDICIAL SALE CANCELLED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF JUDICIAL SALE; Comment: DOS 08/04/23; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Parkwood Homeowners Association of Walden Lake Inc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE; Comment: LA GACETA; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Parkwood Homeowners Association of Walden Lake Inc; Date of Sale: 08/04/2023;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SALE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Parkwood Homeowners Association of Walden Lake Inc; Date of Sale: 08/04/2023;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023

DocketPer FJ / Order Assignment of Bid Not Authorized

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023

HearingJAWS HEARING; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Hearing Location: 800 E. Twiggs St. Tampa, FL 33602 Room 416View Case Hearing Notice for Additional Details, as applicable.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOURT TICKET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
11/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketLIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Parkwood Homeowners Association of Walden Lake Inc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Brito, Howard;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Brito, Howard;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Brito, Howard;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Defendant: Brito, Howard;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Defendant: Brito, Howard;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Defendant: Brito, Howard;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2022

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2022

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less