Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/06/2021 at 09:06:15 (UTC).

PARKS, AMANDA H vs DAVIS, TRISTA

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 PARKS, AMANDA H filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against DAVIS, TRISTA. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Perrone, Frances M, Allen, A. Lisa, Perrone, Frances. M and Perrone, M. Frances. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5240

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Perrone, Frances M

Allen, A. Lisa

Perrone, Frances. M

Perrone, M. Frances

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PARKS, AMANDA H

Lutz, FL 33549

Respondent

DAVIS, TRISTA

Lutz, FL 33549

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • HearingOrder Setting Hearing; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 302 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Perrone, Frances M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCOURT DOCKET PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketORDER DENYING PETITION; Additional Info: Date Signed: 04/27/2021; Judicial Officer: Perrone, Frances M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Comment: ORDER, PETITION, ORDER SETTING HEARING, NOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Additional Info: Respondent: DAVIS, TRISTA; Date Served: 04/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSHERIFF INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDOMESTIC VIOLENCE INTAKE FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFILE HOME LOCATION IS TAMPA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNON-LAWYER DISCLOSURE FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER COPY COVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Comment: Based on the facts stated in your petition, the court has set a hearing to take testimony and make a ruling on the petition. The hearing date is available at HOVER.hillsclerk.com on the Hearings tab of the case. A supplemental petition with additiona; Additional Info: Petitioner: PARKS, AMANDA H; Respondent: DAVIS, TRISTA; Date 2: 04/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Additional Info: Petitioner: PARKS, AMANDA H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketJUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketJUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY; Additional Info: Respondent: DAVIS, TRISTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO HCSO CIVIL PROCESSING UNIT

    Read MoreRead Less