This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/22/2019 at 18:55:41 (UTC).

PARAMOUNT RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE GROUP INC vs CARPENTER, GARY

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 PARAMOUNT RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE GROUP INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CARPENTER, GARY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Manning, M. Daryl and Peacock, A. Emily. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0125

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Manning, M. Daryl

Peacock, A. Emily

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARAMOUNT RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE GROUP INC

Defendants

BRUCE, LAURIE ANN

THE WESTWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE INC

CARPENTER, GARY

UNKNOWN TENANT

UNKNOWN HEIRS OR BENEFICIARIES OF THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM J HUM

WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

PARKWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRITO , LUIZ C.

Defendant Attorneys

MELTON , HOWELL WEBSTER, III

APPLETON , ERIC NEWELL

 

Court Documents

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

01/07/2019: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/07/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED

05/07/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED

E-FILED ALIAS 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/08/2019: E-FILED ALIAS 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/07/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED ALIAS 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/08/2019: E-FILED ALIAS 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/18/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/04/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

05/20/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Voluntary Dismissal and Release of Lis Pendens; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PARAMOUNT RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE GROUP INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PARAMOUNT RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE GROUP INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PARAMOUNT RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE GROUP INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Voluntary Dismissal and Release of Lis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: PARKWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: PARKWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM; Comment: PLT - ADMINISTRATOR AND/OR ATTORNEY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PARAMOUNT RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE GROUP INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PARAMOUNT RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE GROUP INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertification of Original Note Possession FS702.015(4); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PARAMOUNT RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE GROUP INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PARAMOUNT RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE GROUP INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PARAMOUNT RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE GROUP INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PARAMOUNT RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE GROUP INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PARAMOUNT RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE GROUP INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PARAMOUNT RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE GROUP INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PARAMOUNT RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE GROUP INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PARAMOUNT RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE GROUP INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PARAMOUNT RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE GROUP INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketJudgment Code: VDRLPJ; Judgment Description: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Release of Lis Pendens; Instrument Number: 2019314206; Judge: Peacock, Emily A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less