This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/20/2021 at 07:59:38 (UTC).

PALORI COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. vs COVINGTON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 PALORI COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against COVINGTON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Stoddard, Ralph. C., Wolfe, Mark and Stoddard, C.. Ralph. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7631

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Stoddard, Ralph. C.

Wolfe, Mark

Stoddard, C.. Ralph

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PRESTON DEVELOPMENT, LLC

1057 South Clearview Ave

Tampa, FL 33629

PALORI COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC.

234 E. Davis Blvd

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendants

COVINGTON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

945 E. Paces Ferry Rd, Suite 1800,

Atlanta, GA 30326

SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

160 Water Street

New York, NY 10038

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BELT , TOWNSEND JOSEPH

Attorney at ANTHONY & PARTNERS, LLC

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 1600

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

BEDARD , LAURA ELIZABETH

Attorney at ROBERTS REYNOLDS BEDARD & TUZZIO, PLLC

470 Columbia Dr Ste C101

West Palm Beach, FL 33409

LEVY , JOSHUA ASHER

Attorney at KENNEDYS LLP

1395 Brickell Ave Ste 640

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/29/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

09/29/2020: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/29/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

LETTER TO

09/29/2020: LETTER TO

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

10/28/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

10/28/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL

10/15/2020: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

11/10/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

11/10/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/11/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/25/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

11/25/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

11/25/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: TO COUNT III AND MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT 1 OF PLTFS COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: COVINGTON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: COVINGTON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: COVINGTON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 11/2/20 DEFT COVINGTON SPECIALTY INS CO; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PALORI COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC.; Plaintiff: PRESTON DEVELOPMENT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 11/2/20 DEFT SENECA SPECIALTY INS CO; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PALORI COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC.; Plaintiff: PRESTON DEVELOPMENT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PALORI COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC.; Plaintiff: PRESTON DEVELOPMENT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PALORI COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC.; Plaintiff: PRESTON DEVELOPMENT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x2 - eservice@beltfirm.com ; townsend@beltfirm.com; Additional Info: Defendant: COVINGTON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Defendant: SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x2 - eservice@beltfirm.com ; townsend@beltfirm.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PALORI COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC.; Plaintiff: PRESTON DEVELOPMENT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PALORI COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC.; Plaintiff: PRESTON DEVELOPMENT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PALORI COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC.; Plaintiff: PRESTON DEVELOPMENT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PALORI COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC.; Plaintiff: PRESTON DEVELOPMENT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO; Comment: ATTY RE: SUMMONS - eservice@beltfirm.com ; townsend@beltfirm.com

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PALORI COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where COVINGTON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BELT , TOWNSEND JOSEPH