This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 01/17/2022 at 15:39:15 (UTC).

PALMA CEIA CHIROPRACTIC AND WELLNESS CENTER, vs USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corporation

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 PALMA CEIA CHIROPRACTIC AND WELLNESS CENTER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corporation. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Schultz-Kin, Leslie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7854

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Schultz-Kin, Leslie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PALMA CEIA CHIROPRACTIC AND WELLNESS CENTER, as as

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

PALMA CEIA CHIROPRACTIC AND WELLNESS CENTER,

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

WIMBISH, GARY

Defendants

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corpora

200 E. Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corporation

200 E. Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN , PHILIP ALAN

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

Friedman Law Associates, P.L. 2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

ARPEN , CATHERINE VANN

Attorney at DUTTON LAW GROUP

4921 Memorial Hwy Ste 110

Tampa, FL 33634

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/27/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

10/27/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/27/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

10/30/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/27/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/27/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/27/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

General Differentiated Case Management Order

10/30/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/22/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/22/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

01/11/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

01/11/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PALMA CEIA CHIROPRACTIC AND WELLNESS CENTER,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PALMA CEIA CHIROPRACTIC AND WELLNESS CENTER,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PALMA CEIA CHIROPRACTIC AND WELLNESS CENTER,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PALMA CEIA CHIROPRACTIC AND WELLNESS CENTER,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PALMA CEIA CHIROPRACTIC AND WELLNESS CENTER,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PALMA CEIA CHIROPRACTIC AND WELLNESS CENTER,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PALMA CEIA CHIROPRACTIC AND WELLNESS CENTER,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PALMA CEIA CHIROPRACTIC AND WELLNESS CENTER,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PALMA CEIA CHIROPRACTIC AND WELLNESS CENTER LLC, is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARPEN , CATHERINE VANN