This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 04/30/2022 at 21:04:26 (UTC).

PALM WELLNESS CENTER, LLC,Guzman, Carlos vs GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 PALM WELLNESS CENTER, LLC,Guzman, Carlos filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Schultz-Kin, Leslie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4289

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Schultz-Kin, Leslie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PALM WELLNESS CENTER, LLC., as assignee of Carlos

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Guzman, Carlos

PALM WELLNESS CENTER, LLC

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendants

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corpora

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN , PHILIP ALAN

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

Friedman Law Associates, P.L. 2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

SMITH , MELANIE

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DAVID S. DOUGHERTY

4300 W Cypress St Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/21/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/21/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/21/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/21/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/21/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/21/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/22/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/22/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/21/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/21/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/21/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/21/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/21/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/21/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/21/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/29/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PALM WELLNESS CENTER, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PALM WELLNESS CENTER, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PALM WELLNESS CENTER, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PALM WELLNESS CENTER, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PALM WELLNESS CENTER, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PALM WELLNESS CENTER, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PALM WELLNESS CENTER, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PALM WELLNESS CENTER, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Palm Wellness Center, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip Friedman