This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/15/2023 at 17:54:44 (UTC).

Palacio, Olga CORREA vs Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/09/2022 Palacio, Olga CORREA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9425

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Palacio, Olga CORREA

Defendant

Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONSTABLE , JAMES SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

SMITH , ANTHONEY MARCEL

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/09/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/09/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

11/09/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

COMPLAINT

11/09/2022: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/09/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/14/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

11/14/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

12/12/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/14/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

12/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2022

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2022

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Palacio, Olga CORREA;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Palacio, Olga CORREA;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Palacio, Olga CORREA;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Palacio, Olga CORREA;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Palacio, Olga CORREA;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less