This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/27/2023 at 03:35:28 (UTC).

Packer, Adam Bruce vs Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 Packer, Adam Bruce filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2129

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Packer, Adam Bruce

Tampa,, FL 33602

Defendants

Costco Wholesale Corporation

C/O Ct Corporation System 1200 S. Pine Island Road

Plantation,, FL 33324

Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.

C/O Ct Corporation System 1200 S. Pine Island Road

Plantation,, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOODS , KEVIN BRITT

Attorney at WOODS TRIAL LAW

110 N 11Th St Ste 201

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

GASET , KATE FOSTER

Attorney at WICKER SMITH OHARA MCCOY & FORD, P.A.

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 1800

Tampa, FL 33602

WONDER , CHANTEL CHRISTINE

Attorney at GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI

100 Se 2Nd St Ste 3900

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

04/20/2022: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

04/13/2022: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

04/08/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF SERVING

04/05/2022: NOTICE OF SERVING

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

03/25/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/25/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/25/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

General Differentiated Case Management Order

03/15/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/15/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/14/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/14/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/14/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/14/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

03/14/2022: COMPLAINT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/14/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/14/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/14/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/14/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Cancelled Comments: Other CASE MOVED TO FEDERAL CO; Hearing Time: 11:30 AM; Hearing Location: WEBEX: 1-904-900-2303 OR 1-415-655-0001 ACCESS CODE: 132 571 5688; Judicial Officer: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Additional Info: Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation; Defendant: Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL; Additional Info: Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation; Defendant: Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Packer, Adam Bruce;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation; Defendant: Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x2; Additional Info: Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation; Defendant: Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Packer, Adam Bruce;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Packer, Adam Bruce;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Packer, Adam Bruce;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Packer, Adam Bruce;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Packer, Adam Bruce;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Packer, Adam Bruce;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Packer, Adam Bruce;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Packer, Adam Bruce;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Packer, Adam Bruce;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Packer, Adam Bruce;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less