This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 04/23/2022 at 10:29:11 (UTC).

Ottinger, J Terry vs CANARY ONE, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 Ottinger, J Terry filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CANARY ONE, INC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael, Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7094

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ottinger, Ann W

Brandon, FL 33511

Ottinger, J Terry

Brandon, FL 33610

Defendants

CANARY ONE, INC.

15 S. Treasure Drive

Tampa, FL 33609

SUNRISE LANDSCAPE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MASSEY , STARLETT M

Po Box 262

St Petersburg, FL 33731

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/14/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/14/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/14/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

07/15/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

08/17/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

08/19/2021: DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

FINAL JUDGMENT

10/05/2021: FINAL JUDGMENT

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

09/21/2021: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/14/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

08/04/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

Signature Page For Clerk's Default

08/17/2021: Signature Page For Clerk's Default

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

08/17/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

08/19/2021: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ORDER

08/31/2021: ORDER

ORDER

09/09/2021: ORDER

COURT TICKET

09/21/2021: COURT TICKET

AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS

09/23/2021: AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: FJ; Judgment Description: FINAL JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2021507487; Judge: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ottinger, J Terry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 304 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Comment: AT PRE-TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: CANARY ONE, INC.; Defendant Doing Business As: SUNRISE LANDSCAPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Comment: ZOOM NOTICE AND POSSIBLE WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE BY FILING ANSWER FORM OR SETTLEMENT STIPULATION; Additional Info: Date 2: 09/09/2021; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Comment: ZOOM NOTICE AND POSSIBLE WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE BY FILING ANSWER FORM OR SETTLEMENT STIPULATION; Additional Info: Date 2: 08/31/2021; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK; Comment: DUE TO PRETRIAL SET FOR 9/21/2021 @ 10:00AM; Additional Info: Defendant: CANARY ONE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ottinger, Ann W; Plaintiff: Ottinger, J Terry

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ottinger, Ann W; Plaintiff: Ottinger, J Terry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ottinger, Ann W; Plaintiff: Ottinger, J Terry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ottinger, Ann W; Plaintiff: Ottinger, J Terry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ottinger, Ann W; Plaintiff: Ottinger, J Terry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ottinger, Ann W; Plaintiff: Ottinger, J Terry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ottinger, Ann W; Plaintiff: Ottinger, J Terry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ottinger, Ann W; Plaintiff: Ottinger, J Terry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ottinger, Ann W; Plaintiff: Ottinger, J Terry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Massey, Starlett M