This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 02/23/2021 at 00:01:07 (UTC).

OSPREY RUN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC vs MCLAUGHLIN, RYAN

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 OSPREY RUN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed an Other lawsuit against MCLAUGHLIN, RYAN. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4018

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OSPREY RUN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

2111 W Swann Ave Suite 204

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant

MCLAUGHLIN, RYAN

Riverview, FL 33578

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRAZIER , NATHAN A

Attorney at FRAZIER & BOWLES, ATTORNEYS AT LAW

Nathan A Frazier, Frazier & Bowles 202 S Rome Ave Ste 125

Tampa, FL 33606

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

11/25/2020: COMPLAINT

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/03/2020: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/25/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/25/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021054678; Judge: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: OSPREY RUN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: OSPREY RUN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: RYAN MCLAUGHLIN . 12/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketLIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Additional Info: Defendant: MCLAUGHLIN, RYAN; Plaintiff: OSPREY RUN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: MCLAUGHLIN, RYAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: OSPREY RUN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: OSPREY RUN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: OSPREY RUN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: OSPREY RUN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: OSPREY RUN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: OSPREY RUN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NATHAN FRAZIER