Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 05/25/2021 at 08:52:57 (UTC).

Onemain Financial Group Llc vs Porto, Donna P

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 Onemain Financial Group Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Porto, Donna P. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Moody, James. S and Moody, S. James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2093

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Moody, James. S

Moody, S. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Onemain Financial Group Llc

P.O. Box 4400

Jacksonville, FL 32202

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2017-1

("ASF") WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A.

Defendant

Porto, Donna P

Valrico, FL 33594

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOBELLO , THOMAS, III

Attorney at ROLFE & LOBELLO, P.A.

233 E Bay St Ste 720

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/06/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/02/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/02/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/02/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: DONNA P PORTO AKA DONNA PORTO 04/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Porto, Donna P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Onemain Financial Group Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Onemain Financial Group Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Onemain Financial Group Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Onemain Financial Group Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lobello, Thomas, III