This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 05/07/2022 at 10:44:01 (UTC).

Onemain Financial Group Llc vs Nambo, Jennifer J

Case Summary

On 11/11/2021 Onemain Financial Group Llc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Nambo, Jennifer J. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Perrone, M. Frances, Perrone, Frances. M and Perrone, Frances M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2007

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Perrone, M. Frances

Perrone, Frances. M

Perrone, Frances M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Onemain Financial Group Llc Successor By Merger To

P.O. Box 4400

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Onemain Financial Group Llc

P.O. Box 4400

Jacksonville, FL 32202

SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF ALABAMA, INC

Defendant

Nambo, Jennifer J

Brandon, FL 33511

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SORDIAN , EMILY MCREE

Po Box 4400

Jacksonville, FL 32201-4400

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/11/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/11/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/11/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

11/15/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

01/17/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

03/11/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: FOR SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Onemain Financial Group Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Cancelled Comments: Non-Service on Summons; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 302 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Perrone, Frances M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: JENNIFER J. NAMBO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Nambo, Jennifer J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Onemain Financial Group Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Onemain Financial Group Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Onemain Financial Group Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Onemain Financial Group Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC SBM is a litigant

Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SORDIAN, EMILY MCREE