This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/03/2022 at 05:12:36 (UTC).

Onemain Financial Group Llc vs Jacobs, Ronnie

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 Onemain Financial Group Llc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jacobs, Ronnie. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2330

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Onemain Financial Group Llc A Limited Liability Co

P.O. Box 4400

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Onemain Financial Group Llc

P.O. Box 4400

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant

Jacobs, Ronnie

Tampa, FL 33613

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SORDIAN , EMILY MCREE

Suite 200, Bldg A 8777 San Jose Blvd

Jacksonville, FL 32217

ROLFE , AMANDA CLAY

Attorney at ROLFE & LOBELLO, P.A.

233 E Bay St Ste 720

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/17/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/17/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/17/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

05/19/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

05/24/2022: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

05/31/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

COURT TICKET

06/27/2022: COURT TICKET

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 312 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Murphy, J. Logan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TICKET; Comment: PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: RONNIE JACOBS, MAY 30, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Onemain Financial Group Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Jacobs, Ronnie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Onemain Financial Group Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Onemain Financial Group Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Onemain Financial Group Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Onemain Financial Group Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SORDIAN, EMILY MCREE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROLFE, AMANDA CLAY