Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/11/2021 at 22:38:18 (UTC).

Om Health, LLC,BURGESS, CHAD vs Usaa General Indemnity Company

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Om Health, LLC,BURGESS, CHAD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Usaa General Indemnity Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Ober, Ann. Joelle and Ober, Joelle. Ann. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6590

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Ober, Ann. Joelle

Ober, Joelle. Ann

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Om Health, Llc., D/B/A Chiropractic Naturally A/A/O Chad Burgess

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

Om Health, LLC

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

BURGESS, CHAD

CHIROPRACTIC NATURALLY

Defendant

Usaa General Indemnity Company

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KINCER , BENJAMIN ALEXANDER

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN, P.A.

3705 N Himes Ave

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

PLAZA RIOS , YOLANDA

Attorney at ROIG LAWYERS

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 13500

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/24/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/19/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/16/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021265853; Judge: Ober, Joelle Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Usaa General Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Usaa General Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Usaa General Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Usaa General Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Om Health, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Om Health, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Om Health, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Om Health, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Om Health, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Om Health, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Om Health, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Om Health, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Om Health, Llc., D/B/A Chiropractic Naturally A/A/O Angelique Burgess is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KINCER , BENJAMIN ALEXANDER