This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/06/2023 at 12:35:03 (UTC).

Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, Llc vs United Services Automobile Association

Case Summary

On 02/27/2023 Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against United Services Automobile Association. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6581

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, Llc

Rush, Scott

Defendant

United Services Automobile Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM

Defendant Attorney

TOBIN , LEE ANDREW

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/27/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/27/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/27/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

02/27/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/27/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/27/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/27/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

02/28/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

02/28/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

03/08/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/28/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

03/28/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION TO STAY

03/28/2023: MOTION TO STAY

MOTION TO DISMISS

03/28/2023: MOTION TO DISMISS

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM, MOTION TO STRIKE ALLEGATIONS OF COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM, AND MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: United Services Automobile Association;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STAY; Comment: PENDING RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, STRIKE AND FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Additional Info: Defendant: United Services Automobile Association;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: United Services Automobile Association;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: United Services Automobile Association;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: United Services Automobile Association;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less