Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/08/2021 at 07:45:48 (UTC).

Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC vs State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Moody, James. S, Moody, S. James and Moody, James S, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6586

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Moody, James. S

Moody, S. James

Moody, James S, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC

117 S. Willow Ave

Tampa, FL 33606

Shawn and Shawn Moving

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendants

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

One State Farm Plaza

Bloomington, IL 61710

State Farm General Insurance Company

One State Farm Plaza

Bloomington, IL 61710

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

One State Farm Plaza

Bloomington, IL 61710

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIGORI , CHRISTOPHER NELSON

Attorney at CHRISTOPHER LIGORI AND ASSOCIATES

117 S Willow Ave

Tampa, FL 33606-1911

Defendant Attorney

BALENTINE , TINA ROY

Attorney at TINA R. BALENTINE, P.A.

1704 Sir Georges Trl

Lakeland, FL 33809

 

Court Documents

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

04/20/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

04/20/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

04/20/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

04/16/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/16/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/16/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/16/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/16/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 510 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Moody, James S, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCOURT TICKET; Comment: *PRE-TRIAL*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company; Defendant: State Farm General Insurance Company; Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company; Defendant: State Farm General Insurance Company; Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Olympic Integrity Auto Glass Llc A/A/O Melissa Lindquist is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant