Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 05/16/2021 at 08:25:54 (UTC).

Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC vs Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C, Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1703

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Redlawsk, Mike

Tampa, FL 33606

Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC

117 S. Willow Ave

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendants

Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast

One Hartford Plaza

Hartford, CT 06155

Hartford Casualty Insurance Company

One Hartford Plaza

Hartford, CT 06155

Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company

One Hartford Plaza

Hartford, CT 06155

Hartford Fire Insurance Company

One Hartford Plaza

Hartford, CT 06155

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIGORI , CHRISTOPHER NELSON

Attorney at CHRISTOPHER LIGORI AND ASSOCIATES

117 S Willow Ave

Tampa, FL 33606-1911

Defendant Attorney

COLESANTI , PHILIP LOUIS, II

Attorney at ROIG LAWYERS

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 1350

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

ORDER

04/19/2021: ORDER

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

04/06/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

04/06/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

04/06/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

04/06/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/01/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/01/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/01/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/01/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/01/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/01/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Cancelled Comments: Per Judge's Order WAIVER OF AP; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 304 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketANSWER; Comment: WRITTEN INSTEAD OF ZOOM APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL -FILED BY ATTY FOR DEFTS; Additional Info: Defendant: Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company; Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company; Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company; Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company; Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company; Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company; Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketORDER; Comment: JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company; Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company; Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company; Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast; Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC; Plaintiff: Redlawsk, Mike; Private Attorney: COLESANTI , PHILIP LOUIS, II; Private Attorney: LIGORI , CHRISTOPHER NELSON; Date 2: 05/07/2021; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company; Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company; Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company; Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Comment: ZOOM NOTICE AND POSSIBLE WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE BY FILING ANSWER FORM OR SETTLEMENT STIPULATION; Additional Info: Date 2: 04/19/2021; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Olympic Integrity Auto Glass Llc A/A/O Melissa Lindquist is a litigant

Latest cases where HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A FOREIGN INSURER is a litigant

Latest cases where HARTFORD ACCIDENT & INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant