This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 06/23/2022 at 10:57:38 (UTC).

Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC vs United Services Automobile Association

Case Summary

On 04/15/2022 Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against United Services Automobile Association. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Tompkins, M. Joseph and Tompkins, Joseph. M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4557

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Tompkins, M. Joseph

Tompkins, Joseph. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, Llc A/A/O Motvaia Alston

102 Poinciana Lane

Largo, FL 33770

ALSTON, MOTVAIA

Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC

102 Poinciana Lane

Largo, FL 33770

Defendant

United Services Automobile Association

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM

Attorney at UNITED LAW GROUP PA

1920 West Bay Dr Ste 1

Largo, FL 33770

Defendant Attorney

TOBIN , LEE ANDREW

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

360 Central Ave Ste 700

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/15/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/15/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/15/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

04/15/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/15/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

04/15/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/15/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

04/19/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/19/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

04/21/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

MOTION TO STAY

05/11/2022: MOTION TO STAY

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

05/11/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/11/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO DISMISS

05/11/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM, MOTION TO STRIKE ALLEGATIONS OF COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM, AND MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: United Services Automobile Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: United Services Automobile Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: United Services Automobile Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STAY; Comment: PENDING RULING ON DEFENDANT S MOTION TO DISMISS, STRIKE AND FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Additional Info: Defendant: United Services Automobile Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: United Services Automobile Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Olympic Integrity Auto Glass Llc A/A/O Melissa Lindquist is a litigant

Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM