This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/23/2021 at 03:40:10 (UTC).

Olympic Integrity Auto Glass vs Esurance Property And Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 Olympic Integrity Auto Glass filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Esurance Property And Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1833

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Olympic Integrity Auto Glass A/A/O Qaisar Khan

111 Bayside Drive

Clearwater, FL 33767

KHAN, QAISAR

Olympic Integrity Auto Glass

111 Bayside Drive

Clearwater, FL 33767

Defendant

Esurance Property And Casualty Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM

Attorney at VASILAROS LAW LLC

111 Bayside Dr

Clearwater Beach, FL 33767

Defendant Attorney

MARTIN , TACARRA SHANTA

Attorney at ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

4443 Lyons Rd Ste 206

Coconut Creek, FL 33073

 

Court Documents

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/30/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/28/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/28/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Esurance Property And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE; Additional Info: Defendant: Esurance Property And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Esurance Property And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Olympic Integrity Auto Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Olympic Integrity Auto Glass Llc A/A/O Melissa Lindquist is a litigant

Latest cases where ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM