This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 03/17/2020 at 14:31:47 (UTC).

Old Memorial Homeowners Association, Inc. vs Mayfield, Jason V

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 Old Memorial Homeowners Association, Inc filed an Other - Lien Validity lawsuit against Mayfield, Jason V. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Ober, Ann. Joelle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3933

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Lien Validity

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Ober, Ann. Joelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Old Memorial Homeowners Association, Inc.

1964 Bayshore Blvd. Suite A

Dunedin, FL 34698

Defendants

Mayfield, Jason V

Tampa, FL 33626

Mayfield, Amanda B

Tampa, FL 33626

Any Unknown Occupants In Possession

Tampa, FL 33626

Suntrust Bank

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GREENBERG , DANIEL J, Esquire

Attorney at CIANFRONE NIKOLOFF GRANT GREENBERG

1964 Bayshore Blvd Ste A

Dunedin, FL 34698

GREENBERG , DANIEL JASON

Attorney at CIANFRONE NIKOLOFF GRANT GREENBERG

1964 Bayshore Blvd Ste A

Dunedin, FL 34698

Defendant Attorneys

STOREY, PHILIP D, Esquire

Attorney at ALVAREZ WINTHROP THOMPSON & STOREY PA

Po Box 3511

Orlando, FL 32802

STOREY , PHILIP DEE

Attorney at ALVAREZ WINTHROP THOMPSON & STOREY PA

Po Box 3511

Orlando, FL 32802

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

03/14/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

03/14/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

03/14/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/14/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/06/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

02/06/2019: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER AND CLAIM FOR SURPLUS FUNDS

02/06/2019: ANSWER AND CLAIM FOR SURPLUS FUNDS

E-FILED 30 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/23/2019: E-FILED 30 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED 30 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/23/2019: E-FILED 30 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED 30 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/23/2019: E-FILED 30 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

01/23/2019: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/16/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

LIS PENDENS

01/16/2019: LIS PENDENS

LIS PENDENS

01/16/2019: LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT

01/16/2019: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/16/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/16/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/16/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Code: VDRLPJ; Judgment Description: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Release of Lis Pendens; Instrument Number: 2019263459; Judge: Ober, Joelle Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Voluntary Dismissal and Release of Lis Pendens; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Old Memorial Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Voluntary Dismissal and Release of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketNO MAILING; Comment: Of N.O.A. & Pledings to any named defendant(s) as no last known address or postage paid addressed envelopes provided.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED RETURNED TO ATTORNEY; Comment: CIANFRONE, NIKOLOFF, GRANT & GREENBERG, P.A. 1964 BAYSHORE BOULEVARD, SUITE A DUNEDIN, FL 34698

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: AMANDA B MAYFIELD; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Old Memorial Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: JASON V MAYFIELD; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Old Memorial Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: ANY UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Old Memorial Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: SUNTRUST BANK C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY 1/30/19; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Old Memorial Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: Filer has been notified to submit the original paperwork to the Clerk s Customer Service Center for processing.; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Old Memorial Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Old Memorial Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Old Memorial Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Old Memorial Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Comment: Filing # 83440719; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Old Memorial Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Old Memorial Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Old Memorial Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Old Memorial Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Old Memorial Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less