This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/16/2023 at 18:17:20 (UTC).

NUVISION AUTO GLASS LLC, vs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corporation

Case Summary

On 12/07/2022 NUVISION AUTO GLASS LLC, filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corporation. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, S. James and Giardina, James. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7776

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, S. James

Giardina, James. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cruz, Sevilla

NUVISION AUTO GLASS LLC,

2700 W. Dr. Mlk, Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corporation

200 E. Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS , JAMES ROGER, Jr

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

2700 W. Dr. Mlk, Jr. Blvd., Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

PATRICH , MELANIE YAEL

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

360 Central Ave Ste 700

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/07/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/07/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/07/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/07/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/07/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/07/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/15/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

12/15/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/06/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

01/09/2023: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

MOTION TO DISMISS

01/09/2023: MOTION TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION TO STAY AND COMPEL APPRAISAL; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corporation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Comment: OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION TO STAY AND COMPEL APPRAISAL; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corporation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corporation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corporation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NUVISION AUTO GLASS LLC,;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NUVISION AUTO GLASS LLC,;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NUVISION AUTO GLASS LLC,;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NUVISION AUTO GLASS LLC,;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NUVISION AUTO GLASS LLC,;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NUVISION AUTO GLASS LLC,;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NUVISION AUTO GLASS LLC,;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less