This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 11/25/2021 at 00:37:55 (UTC).

NUVISION AUTO GLASS, LLC vs Allstate Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 NUVISION AUTO GLASS, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Allstate Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hooi, J. Michael and Hooi, Michael. J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2448

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hooi, J. Michael

Hooi, Michael. J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nuvision Auto Glass, Llc A/A/O Salvatore Vasile

102 Poinciana Lane

Largo, FL 33770

NUVISION AUTO GLASS, LLC

102 Poinciana Lane

Largo, FL 33770

VASILE, SALVATORE

Defendant

Allstate Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM

Attorney at VASILAROS LAW LLC

111 Bayside Dr

Clearwater Beach, FL 33767

Defendant Attorney

MARTIN , TACARRA SHANTA

Attorney at ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

4443 Lyons Rd Ste 206

Coconut Creek, FL 33073

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

10/07/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/07/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

10/11/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY AS IMPROPER DEFENDANT, DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION, AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED TO DIVISION N PER AO S-2021-057

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NUVISION AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NUVISION AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NUVISION AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NUVISION AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NUVISION AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NUVISION AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NUVISION AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NUVISION AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nuvision Auto Glass, Llc A/A/O Stephen Futch is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant