This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 05/16/2022 at 07:40:20 (UTC).

NUVISION AUTO GLASS LLC vs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 NUVISION AUTO GLASS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, S. James and Giardina, James. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2554

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, S. James

Giardina, James. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NUVISION AUTO GLASS LLC, a/a/o Kirk Korkes

2700 W. Dr. Mlk, Jr. Blvd., Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Korkes, Kirk

NUVISION AUTO GLASS LLC

2700 W. Dr. Mlk, Jr. Blvd., Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS , JAMES ROGER, Jr

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

2700 W. Dr. Mlk, Jr. Blvd., Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS , LISA MOURY

Attorney at COLE, SCOTT & KISSANE, P.A.

4301 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/14/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/14/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/14/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

NOTICE OF INTENT

04/15/2022: NOTICE OF INTENT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

04/13/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

03/21/2022: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

OBJECTION

03/21/2022: OBJECTION

OBJECTION

03/21/2022: OBJECTION

OBJECTION

03/21/2022: OBJECTION

OBJECTION

03/21/2022: OBJECTION

MOTION TO DISMISS

03/21/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

03/07/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/07/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/07/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/24/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/24/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE

02/24/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/18/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, LYNETTE COLEMAN, March 2, 2022; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NUVISION AUTO GLASS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Comment: AND MOTION TO STAY ANY AND ALL DISCOVERY SERVED; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION TO STAY AND COMPEL APPRAISAL; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT AND WRITTEN DISCOVERY PROPOUNDED THEREWITH; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NUVISION AUTO GLASS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NUVISION AUTO GLASS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NUVISION AUTO GLASS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NUVISION AUTO GLASS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NUVISION AUTO GLASS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nuvision Auto Glass, Llc A/A/O Stephen Futch is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLLINS , JAMES ROGER, Jr