This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 02/22/2021 at 22:48:32 (UTC).

Nunery, Charles vs Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 Nunery, Charles filed an Other lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9287

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nunery, Charles

Palm Coast, FL 32164

Defendant

Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

702 Southwest 8Th Street

Bentonville, AR 72716

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FULGENCIO , FELIPE BASTOS

Attorney at FULGENCIO LAW

105 S Edison Ave

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

MORALES , MICHELE DENISE

Attorney at QUINTAIROS PRIETO WOOD & BOYER

255 S Orange Ave Ste 900

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/28/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/16/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

12/16/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/01/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/25/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/25/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

11/25/2020: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Nunery, Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Comment: COS 02/15/2021 / NO EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION; Comment: **AMENDED MOTION** TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR IMPROPER VENUE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND STAY DISCOVERY, GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED ON FEBRUARY 10, 2021, AND GRANT; Additional Info: Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP; Date 2: 02/15/2021; Judicial Officer: Barbas, Rex

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Additional Info: Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketORDER; Comment: REQUIRING ELECTRONIC/TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES VIA ZOOM ON 02/15/21 AT 10:30 AM 02/10/21 RMB; Additional Info: Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP; Plaintiff: Nunery, Charles; Private Attorney: FULGENCIO , FELIPE BASTOS; Private Attorney: MORALES , MICHELE DENISE; Date 2: 02/10/2021; Judicial Officer: Barbas, Rex

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Comment: COS 2/10/2021 / NO EXHIBITS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Nunery, Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Comment: COS 02/04/2021 / NO EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 12/3/20 DEFT WAL-MART STORES EAST, LPC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Nunery, Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Nunery, Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Nunery, Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Nunery, Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Nunery, Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores East, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELIPE B FULGENCIO, ESQ