This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 05/27/2020 at 09:39:52 (UTC).

Novitzki, Joseph vs Zaderej, Karen

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 Novitzki, Joseph filed an Other lawsuit against Zaderej, Karen. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephens, Scott. Steven. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1745

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Stephens, Scott. Steven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Novitzki, Joseph

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendants

Axogen, Inc.

13631 Progress Boulevard Suite 400

Alachua, FL 32615

Freitag, Gregory G.

Minneapolis, MN 55403

Wendell, Amy

Franklin, MA 02038

Rudelius, Robert J.

Washington, DC 20024

Gold, Mark

Ponte Vedra Beach, FL 32082

Neels, Guido J.

Indianapolis, IN 46240

Zaderej, Karen

Newberry, FL 32669

Grooms, Jamie M.

Gainesville, FL 32653

Mariani, Peter J.

Zionsville, IN 46077

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COSTA , GABRIEL ADRIAN

Attorney at CALLAHAN & FUSCO, LLC

200 Sw 1St Ave Ste 840

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

11/15/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

11/15/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

12/02/2019: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

11/15/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

11/15/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

EX PARTE MOTION

11/25/2019: EX PARTE MOTION

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

11/15/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL

01/24/2020: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/20/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: STIPFORDSM; Judgment Description: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2020024858; Judge: Stephens, Steven Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Defendant: Axogen, Inc.; Defendant: Freitag, Gregory G.; Defendant: Gold, Mark; Defendant: Grooms, Jamie M.; Defendant: Mariani, Peter J.; Defendant: Neels, Guido J.; Defendant: Rudelius, Robert J.; Defendant: Wendell, Amy; Defendant: Zaderej, Karen; Plaintiff: Novitzki, Joseph; Private Attorney: COSTA , GABRIEL ADRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DESIGNATING CASE COMPLEX; Comment: DIRECTIONS TO THE CLERK OF COURT; Additional Info: Defendant: Axogen, Inc.; Defendant: Freitag, Gregory G.; Defendant: Gold, Mark; Defendant: Grooms, Jamie M.; Defendant: Mariani, Peter J.; Defendant: Neels, Guido J.; Defendant: Rudelius, Robert J.; Defendant: Wendell, Amy; Defendant: Zaderej, Karen; Plaintiff: Novitzki, Joseph; Private Attorney: COSTA , GABRIEL ADRIAN; Date Signed: 01/09/2020; Judicial Officer: Stephens, Steven Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketE-FILED MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Novitzki, Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketE-FILED MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Novitzki, Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: ( JOINT ) TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Axogen, Inc.; Date 2: 12/17/2019; Judicial Officer: Stephens, Steven Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: (JOINT) TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Axogen, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER; Comment: DANA OWENS/JOHN OWENS C/O SERVICE OF PROCESS, INC.; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Novitzki, Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE MOTION; Comment: TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Novitzki, Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Novitzki, Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Novitzki, Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Novitzki, Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Novitzki, Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Novitzki, Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Novitzki, Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Novitzki, Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Novitzki, Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Novitzki, Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Novitzki, Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AXOGEN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COSTA GABRIEL A