Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 03/01/2019 at 02:53:06 (UTC).

Notice of Appeal of:Dick, Matthew vs GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/31/2016 Notice of Appeal of Dick, Matthew filed an Other lawsuit against GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5106

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GILBO, DAVID

ROBBINS, RONALD

Dick, Matthew

New Port Richey, FL 34653

CERTIFIED WINDSHIELD LLC

SUPERIOR AUTO GLASS OF TAMPA BAY INC

HART, GEORGE

LANHAM, FRENCH

Defendants

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

GEICO INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FARRIOR , AMY STUART

Attorney at BUELL & ELLIGETT, P.A.

3003 W Azeele St Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33609

PRIETO , ANTHONY T, Esquire

3705 N Himes Ave

Tampa, FL 33607

ELLIGETT , RAYMOND THOMAS, Jr

Attorney at BUELL & ELLIGETT, P.A.

3003 W Azeele St Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33609

LAURATO , MICHAEL VINCENT

1902 W Cass St

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorneys

TROWELL , LINDSEY RYAN

Attorney at SMITH, GAMBRELL & RUSSELL, LLP

50 N Laura St Ste 2600

Jacksonville, FL 32202

MAHER , STEPHEN T

Attorney at SHUTTS & BOWEN LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 4100

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

OPINION

03/27/2018: OPINION

NOTICE

07/31/2017: NOTICE

ORDER DENYING MOTION

07/27/2017: ORDER DENYING MOTION

ORDER

05/08/2017: ORDER

NOTICE

05/03/2017: NOTICE

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

01/03/2017: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

FEE LETTER SENT

09/14/2016: FEE LETTER SENT

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

08/05/2016: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

APPEAL TO CIRCUIT COURT

05/27/2016: APPEAL TO CIRCUIT COURT

ORDER FROM DCA

02/20/2019: ORDER FROM DCA

ORDER FROM DCA

05/11/2018: ORDER FROM DCA

OPPOSITION TO

02/08/2018: OPPOSITION TO

NOTICE

06/20/2017: NOTICE

INITIAL BRIEF FILED

02/20/2017: INITIAL BRIEF FILED

ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION WITH

01/19/2017: ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION WITH

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

01/05/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

ORDER GRANTING

09/07/2016: ORDER GRANTING

ORDER GRANTING

08/25/2016: ORDER GRANTING

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FROM DCA; Comment: 2D18-1858

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FROM DCA; Comment: 2D18-1858

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • ORDER FROM DCA; Comment: 2D18-1858

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FROM DCA; Comment: MAY 31, 2018, 18-1858

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF NEW CASE; Comment: 2D18-1858

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FROM DCA; Comment: 2D18-1858

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MANDATE REVERSED & REMANDED; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY; Defendant: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY; Plaintiff: CERTIFIED WINDSHIELD LLC; Plaintiff: Dick, Matthew; Plaintiff: GILBO, DAVID; Plaintiff: HART, GEORGE; Plaintiff: LANHAM, FRENCH; Plaintiff: ROBBINS, RONALD; Plaintiff: SUPERIOR AUTO GLASS OF TAMPA BAY INC; Vol./Book: 25714, Page: 727, Number of Pages: 727

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER; Comment: DENYING REHEARING -- 04/17/18 PLH; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dick, Matthew; Plaintiff: SUPERIOR AUTO GLASS OF TAMPA BAY INC; Date 2: 04/17/2018; Judicial Officer: Judge, Presiding

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO STRIKE; Comment: FILED BY APPELLEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO; Comment: TO APPELLEES 9.330 MOTION FOR REHEARING ON ENTITLEMENT TO ATTORNEYS FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: (UNOPPOSED) TO SERVE INITIAL BRIEF; Additional Info: Defendant: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: (UNOPPOSED) TO SERVE INITIAL BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • APPEAL PREPARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • FEE LETTER SENT; Comment: $175..00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGN OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dick, Matthew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGN OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF NEW CASE; Comment: appeal from 15-cc-9347

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • FEE LETTER SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEAL TO CIRCUIT COURT; Comment: FROM COUNTY CIVIL 15-CC-009347; Additional Info: Vol./Book: 24123, Page: 1071, Number of Pages: 1071

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • FILE HOME LOCATION IS TAMPA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Auto Glass Of Tampa Bay, Inc. A/A/O John Tomsuden is a litigant

Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant