This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 03/13/2022 at 10:45:21 (UTC).

NEW VISION AUTO GLASS vs TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 NEW VISION AUTO GLASS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Schultz-Kin, Leslie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3366

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Schultz-Kin, Leslie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEW VISION AUTO GLASS AAO DEANNA LEW

1061 Maitland Center Commons Blvd

Maitland, FL 32751

LEW, DEANNA

NEW VISION AUTO GLASS

1061 Maitland Center Commons Blvd

Maitland, FL 32751

Defendant

TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAGROW , JOHN Z

Attorney at JOHN Z LAGROW PA

1876 Oakbrook Dr

Longwood, FL 32779

Defendant Attorney

FRISCHLING , ALLISON BLYTHE

Attorney at TRAVELERS LEGAL DEPARTMENT

Po Box 2904

Hartford, CT 06104

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/18/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/18/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/18/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

INTERROGATORIES

01/18/2022: INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/18/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/18/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/20/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/20/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

MOTION TO DISMISS

02/16/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/28/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/28/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES; Additional Info: Defendant: TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NEW VISION AUTO GLASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NEW VISION AUTO GLASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NEW VISION AUTO GLASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NEW VISION AUTO GLASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NEW VISION AUTO GLASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NEW VISION AUTO GLASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NEW VISION AUTO GLASS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW VISION AUTO GLASS AAO DEANNA LEW is a litigant

Latest cases where TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN LAGROW