This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/15/2020 at 03:49:04 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC vs UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF THE ESTATE OF ANNETTE L BACON

Case Summary

On 02/07/2019 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF THE ESTATE OF ANNETTE L BACON. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Peacock, A. Emily and Judge, Presiding. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1402

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Peacock, A. Emily

Judge, Presiding

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

100 West Cypress Creek Road Suite 700

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

Defendants

FELDER, BENJAMIN WILLIAMS, Jr

Bowie, FL 20720

SHERMAN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

80 State Street

Albany, NY 12207

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF REGINALD LEE FELDER

Tampa, FL 33617

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

Tampa, FL 33612

SHIPP, ROBERT LEE

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33312

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

4851 Cox Road

Glen Allen, VA 23060

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BENJAMIN WILLIAMS FELDER, JR

Bowie, MD 20720

FELDER, REGINALD LEE

Tampa, FL 33617

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

Tampa, FL 33612

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT LEE SHIPP

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33312

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE S

Tampa, FL 33602

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF THE ESTATE OF ANNETTE L BACON

Tampa, FL 33612

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ALICIA L NELSON

Tampa, FL 33647

NELSON, ALICIA L

Tampa, FL 33647

Not Classified By Court

FHA ATTORNEY SERVICES LLC

Po Box 341077

Tampa, FL 33694

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHIN-DUNCAN , KARISSA, Esquire

Attorney at GREENSPOON MARDER LLP

Trade Centre South, Suite 700 100 W Cypress Creek Rd

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

CHIN-DUNCAN , KARISSA

Attorney at TRADE CENTRE SOUTH, SUITE 700

100 W Cypress Creek Rd

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

07/03/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

03/14/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/08/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/08/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/07/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/07/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/07/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/07/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/07/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

NOTICE OF SERVING

10/01/2019: NOTICE OF SERVING

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

06/28/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

NOTICE OF NON-JURY TRIAL

07/23/2019: NOTICE OF NON-JURY TRIAL

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

06/28/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

LETTER FROM CLERK

02/14/2019: LETTER FROM CLERK

VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

02/07/2019: VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/07/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/07/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/07/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE; Additional Info: Defendant: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Defendant: FELDER, BENJAMIN WILLIAMS, Jr; Defendant: FELDER, REGINALD LEE; Defendant: NELSON, ALICIA L; Defendant: SHERMAN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC; Defendant: SHIPP, ROBERT LEE; Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE S; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ALICIA L NELSON; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BENJAMIN WILLIAMS FELDER, JR; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF REGINALD LEE FELDER; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT LEE SHIPP; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF THE ESTATE OF ANNETTE L BACON; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT #1; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT #2; Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Successful Bidder: FHA ATTORNEY SERVICES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketDEPOSIT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACCOUNT; Comment: BALANCE PAID $ 103,451.70 CLERK FEE $ 1,629.00 DOC STAMP FEE $ 756.70; Additional Info: Successful Bidder: FHA ATTORNEY SERVICES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketBID INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketFee Worksheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • HearingMORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SALE; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Judicial Officer: Judge, Presiding

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less