This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 11/30/2019 at 11:10:51 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC vs The Unknown Heirs of Edwin L Dunn, deceased

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against The Unknown Heirs of Edwin L Dunn, deceased. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Cook, J.. Martha. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1296

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Cook, J.. Martha

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

P O Box 23028

Tampa, FL 33623

Defendants

Highland Park Neighborhood Association, Inc

5550 W. Executive Dr, Suite 250

Tampa, FL 33609

Dunn, Joann

Tampa, FL 33601

Unknown Party 1

Tampa, FL 33626

Dunn, Danielle

Orlando, FL 32803

Unknown Party 4

Tampa, FL 33626

Dunn, Kelsey

Palm Harbor, FL 34685

MacDonald, Lisa

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

Dunn, Sean

Palm Harbor, FL 34685

Rada, Kimberly Kae

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

Townhomes of Highland Park Association, Inc

2535 Landmark Dr, Suite 212

Clearwater, FL 33761

The Unknown Heirs of Edwin L Dunn, deceased

Tampa, FL 33626

Unknown Party 3

Tampa, FL 33626

Dunn, Rachel

Palm Harbor, FL 34685

Unknown Party 2

Tampa, FL 33626

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ADAMS , KERRY, Esquire

Attorney at ALBERTELLI LAW

P O Box 23028

Tampa, FL 33623

ADAMS , KERRY

Attorney at SHAPIRO, FISHMAN & GACHE, LLP

4630 Woodland Corporate Blvd Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33614

Defendant Attorneys

FUEYO , RICHARD KENT

Attorney at TRENAM LAW

101 E Kennedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33602

FRISCIA , FRANCIS EDWARD

Attorney at FRISCIA & ROSS P A

5550 W Executive Dr Ste 250

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/19/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/19/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

02/19/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/14/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/06/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/05/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/05/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/05/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

02/05/2019: VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF

11/05/2019: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

02/21/2019: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/19/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/06/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/06/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/06/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/06/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/05/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/05/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Comment: - OF AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. NOT ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF; Comment: -MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Comment: AFFIDAVITS OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS AND REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES. NOT ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • RESPONSE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • NO MAILING; Comment: Of N.O.A. and Pleadings to any defendant(s) as no last know address or postage paid addressed envelopes and copies provided.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • LETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED RETURNED TO ATTORNEY; Comment: ALBERTELLI LAW P O BOX 23028 TAMPA, FL 33623; Additional Info: Date 2: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • NOTICE; Comment: Filer has been notified to submit the original paperwork to the Clerk s Customer Service Center for processing.; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less