This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/27/2023 at 19:29:52 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC vs THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES GRANTEES IN THE ESTATE OF KIMBERLY M. FRIERSON AKA KIMBERLY FRIERSON

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES GRANTEES IN THE ESTATE OF KIMBERLY M FRIERSON AKA KIMBERLY FRIERSON. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Peacock, A. Emily and Peacock, Emily. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0678

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Peacock, A. Emily

Peacock, Emily. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

6409 Congress Avenue Suite 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendants

FRIERSON, JESSIE, III

Bowie, MD 20716

ISPC

C/O President, Vice President Or Any Other Officer 1115 Gunn Hwy Ste 100

Odessa, FL 33556

PETERSON-FRIERSON-NEAL, WANDA

Tampa, FL 33612

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES GRANTEES IN THE ESTATE OF KIMBERLY M. FRIERSON AKA KIMBERLY FRIERSON

Ruskin, FL 33570

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STARASOLER , TRACY

Attorney at ROBERTSON, ANSCHUTZ, SCHNEID, CRANE

6409 Congress Ave Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant Attorneys

BELMUDEZ , SEAN PAUL

Attorney at ISPC

1115 Gunn Hwy Ste 100

Odessa, FL 33556

ALFONSO , DON CHRISTOPHER

Attorney at D. CHRISTOPHER ALFONSO, P.L.

3002 W Kennedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION

02/24/2023: PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION

REPLY

02/23/2023: REPLY

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/23/2023: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/17/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/17/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

LETTER TO CLERK FROM

02/13/2023: LETTER TO CLERK FROM

NOTICE OF ACTION

02/13/2023: NOTICE OF ACTION

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION

02/09/2023: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

02/09/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/25/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/25/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/25/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

01/25/2023: Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

01/25/2023: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/25/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/25/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/25/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/25/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY; Comment: TO ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, THE INDEPENDENT SAVINGS PLAN COMPANY D/B/A/ ISPC; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: PETERSON-FRIERSON-NEAL, WANDA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL REQUESTING NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED TO THE DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION; Comment: ISSUED AND MAILED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR PUBLICATION; ALSO MAILED TO DEFENDANTS; ON OR BEFORE 03/XX/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: JESSIE FRIERSON III 2/4/2023; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Additional Info: Defendant: FRIERSON, JESSIE, III; Defendant: ISPC; Defendant: PETERSON-FRIERSON-NEAL, WANDA; Defendant: THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES GRANTEES IN THE ESTATE OF KIMBERLY M. FRIERSON AKA KIMBERLY FRIERSON; Plaintiff: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X4; Additional Info: Defendant: FRIERSON, JESSIE, III; Defendant: ISPC; Defendant: PETERSON-FRIERSON-NEAL, WANDA; Defendant: THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES GRANTEES IN THE ESTATE OF KIMBERLY M. FRIERSON AKA KIMBERLY FRIERSON;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less