This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/10/2022 at 19:12:14 (UTC).

NATIONAL SOURCING INC vs ARMED FORCES SERVICES CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 NATIONAL SOURCING INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ARMED FORCES SERVICES CORPORATION. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4460

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL SOURCING INC

Defendant

ARMED FORCES SERVICES CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MITCHELL , J. CARLTON

Defendant Attorney

GATTO , JON TAYLOR

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/28/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/28/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

05/28/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/28/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/29/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/29/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

06/09/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

06/28/2021: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/28/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Cancelled Comments: Other REMOVED TO DISTRICT COUR; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 501 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Barbas, Rex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NORFC; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Judge: Barbas, Rex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: OF REMOVAL (ATTCHD); Additional Info: Defendant: ARMED FORCES SERVICES CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: ARMED FORCES SERVICES CORPORATION C/O: CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY, REGISTERED AGENT. 6/9/2021; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONAL SOURCING INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: ARMED FORCES SERVICES CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONAL SOURCING INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONAL SOURCING INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONAL SOURCING INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NATIONAL SOURCING INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less