This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 11/26/2022 at 18:18:50 (UTC).

NANCY C. MILLAN, Tax Collector of Hillsborough County, Florida vs Delinquent 2021 Tangible Personal Property Taxpayers

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 NANCY C MILLAN, Tax Collector of Hillsborough County, Florida filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Delinquent 2021 Tangible Personal Property Taxpayers. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5989

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

 

Party Details

Defendants

2 BROTHERS FOOD AND GROCERY, ALONZO MOTA

Tampa, FL 33614

2 MARIOS BARBER SHOP OF TAMPA BAY LLC

1747 W Hillsborough Ave

Tampa, FL 33603

21 BARBER LLC

10937 N 56Th St

Tampa, FL 33617

24/7 LABS MEMORIAL HWY

Tampa, FL 33615

2K EXPRESS, MOHAMAD SAAD

Tampa, FL 33610

3 MINISTERS OF GOD MINISTRIES CHRISTIAN CHURCH

Tampa, FL 33605

301 BC ONE LLC

301 Business Center Llc Po Box 30428

Charlotte, NC 28230

32 BELOW THAI ICE C REAM

Plant City, FL 33563

35 BELOW ICE CREAM AND BUBBLE TEA, LAI M TU

Tampa, FL 33647

3CX USA CORP, NICHOLAS GALEA

4300 W Cypress St Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33607

5-GOLD NAILS LLC, KIET LE

8102 Moccasin Trail Dr

Riverview, FL 33578

57TH STREET MEDIA SCHOOL OF VOICEOVERS LLC, KIETH A LEACH

6105 Memorial Hwy Ste A1

Tampa, FL 33615

717 LLC, MICHAEL T STEWART

717 S Howard Ave

Tampa, FL 33606

786 DOWNTOWN INC, UMAR FAROOK

3914 N Us Highway 301 Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33619

78TH STREET CAR WASH

Valrico, FL 33596

7TH + GROVE

Tampa, FL 33605

7TH + GROVE HOSPITALITY GROUP SOUTH LLC

1930 E 7Th Ave

Tampa, FL 33605

81 BAY BREWING CO

4465 W Gandy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33611

1,114 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FITZGERALD , BRIAN THOMAS

Attorney at HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE

601 E Kennedy Blvd Fl 27

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/01/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/15/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

07/15/2022: COMPLAINT

JUDGE'S COPIES OF PLEADINGS

10/26/2022: JUDGE'S COPIES OF PLEADINGS

CLERK'S MINUTES OF NON JURY TRIAL

10/26/2022: CLERK'S MINUTES OF NON JURY TRIAL

EVIDENCE DATA SHEET

10/26/2022: EVIDENCE DATA SHEET

MOTION TO - FOR

10/18/2022: MOTION TO - FOR

CLERK MAILED COPY OF RESPONSE

10/07/2022: CLERK MAILED COPY OF RESPONSE

CLERK MAILED COPY OF RESPONSE

10/07/2022: CLERK MAILED COPY OF RESPONSE

REQUEST

10/06/2022: REQUEST

PROOF OF PAYMENT OF

09/29/2022: PROOF OF PAYMENT OF

COPY OF

09/23/2022: COPY OF

REQUEST FOR

09/22/2022: REQUEST FOR

ORDER ON - TO - FOR

11/02/2022: ORDER ON - TO - FOR

RETURNED MAIL

09/16/2022: RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

09/15/2022: RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

09/15/2022: RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

08/24/2022: RETURNED MAIL

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: OOTF; Judgment Description: ORDER ON - TO - FOR; Instrument Number: 2022527069; Judge: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON - TO - FOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGE'S COPIES OF PLEADINGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S MINUTES OF NON JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVIDENCE DATA SHEET; Comment: EDS# 213480

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO - FOR; Comment: DISMISS CASE FROM REDDYWEAR LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK MAILED COPY OF RESPONSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK MAILED COPY OF RESPONSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST; Comment: TO POSTPONE COURT DATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PAYMENT OF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Additional Info: Defendant: VAPERS DEPOT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Additional Info: Defendant: COHEN AND DEPAUL PA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: OCTOBER 26, 2022 at 9:30AM - TAX COLLECTOR'S PETITION FOR ORDER RATIFYING AND CONFIRMING ISSUANCE OF DELINQUENT TANGIBLE PERSONAL PROPERTY TAX WARRANTS FOR THE TAX YEAR 2021; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NANCY C. MILLAN, Tax Collector of Hillsborough County, Florida;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NANCY C. MILLAN, Tax Collector of Hillsborough County, Florida;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NANCY C. MILLAN, Tax Collector of Hillsborough County, Florida;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: BRIAN T. FITZGERALD; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NANCY C. MILLAN, Tax Collector of Hillsborough County, Florida;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Comment: PETITION FOR ORDER RATIFYING AND CONFIRMING ISSUANCE OF DELINQUENT TANGIBLE PERSONAL PROPERTY TAX WARRANTS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NANCY C. MILLAN, Tax Collector of Hillsborough County, Florida;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZGERALD , BRIAN THOMAS