Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 02/03/2021 at 18:54:17 (UTC).

MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P. vs Pita, David E.

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 MTGLQ INVESTORS, L P filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Pita, David E. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2539

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.

C/O Brian L. Rosaler, 1701 W. Hillsboro Blvd. Suite 400

Deerfield Beach, FL 33442

Defendants

FLORIDA LIMITED INVESTMENT PROPERTIES, INC

C/O Bruce R. Emerson, Director 2840 W Bay Drive, Suite 156

Belleair Bluffs, FL 33770

Unknown Tenant(s) in Possession #1

Riverview, FL 33578

Bonafide Properties, LLC

C/O Bruce Emerson, R.A. 2840 West Bay Drive, Pmb 156

Belleair Bluffs, FL 33770

Pita, David E.

Land O' Lakes, FL 34638

EAGLE PALMS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

C/O Shumaker Loop & Kenrick, R.A. 101 East Kenney Blvd, Suite#28

Tampa, FL 33602

Unknown Tenant(s) in Possession #2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COHN , RICHARD PAUL

Attorney at POPKIN & ROSALER, P.A.

1701 W Hillsboro Blvd Ste 400

Deerfield Beach, FL 33442-1572

RUFF , MICHAEL THOMAS

Attorney at PADGETT LAW GROUP

6267 Old Water Oak Rd Ste 203

Tallahassee, FL 32312

Defendant Attorneys

SEGAL , LEE

Attorney at SEGAL & SCHUH LAW GROUP, P.L.

18167 U.S. Hwy 19 N. Ste 100

Clearwater, FL 33764

MORRELL , CLINTON SCOTT

Attorney at SHUMAKER, LOOP & KENDRICK LLP

Bank Of America Plaza 101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 2800

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON

09/30/2020: ORDER ON

ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

06/11/2020: ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

06/05/2020: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

06/05/2020: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

LIS PENDENS

12/11/2019: LIS PENDENS

ORDER

09/15/2020: ORDER

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/28/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/10/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/05/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO - FOR

04/20/2020: MOTION TO - FOR

VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

12/11/2019: VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

LIS PENDENS

12/11/2019: LIS PENDENS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/11/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/11/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/11/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/11/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/11/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/11/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON; Comment: MOTION TO DISSOLVE LIS PENDENS THE MOTION IS PREMATURE. ACCORDINGLING, THE COURT DECLINES TO RULE UPON SAME AT THIS TIME. ,OTION MAY REMAIN PENDING, BUT WILL NOT OF ITSELF TO PREVENT THE CASE FROM BEING AT ISSUE AND ADVANTCING TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ; Additional Info: Defendant: Bonafide Properties, LLC; Defendant: EAGLE PALMS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC; Defendant: Pita, David E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Comment: REQUIRING ELECTRONIC/TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES ON 9/23/2020 @ 9:30 AM; Additional Info: Defendant: Bonafide Properties, LLC; Defendant: EAGLE PALMS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC; Defendant: FLORIDA LIMITED INVESTMENT PROPERTIES, INC; Defendant: Pita, David E.; Defendant: Unknown Tenant(s) in Possession #1; Defendant: Unknown Tenant(s) in Possession #2; Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.; Private Attorney: MORRELL , CLINTON SCOTT; Private Attorney: RUFF , MICHAEL THOMAS; Private Attorney: SEGAL , LEE; Date 2: 09/15/2020; Judicial Officer: Barbas, Rex

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: MOTION TO DISSOLVE LIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL; Comment: FOR PLTF TO: MICHAEL RUFF; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.; Date Signed: 06/11/2020; Judicial Officer: Barbas, Rex

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO - FOR; Comment: EXCUSED FROM MEDIATION, NON-JURY TRIAL AND ALL RELATED PRETRIAL PROCEDURES; Additional Info: Defendant: EAGLE PALMS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA INVESTMENT PROPERTIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BONAFIDE PROPERTIES LLC AS TRUSTEE ONLY, UNDER THE 13014 EARLY RUN LN LAND TRUST, WITH FULL POWER AND AUTHORITY TO PROTECT, CONSERVE,SELL,LEASE,ENCUMBER OR OTHERWISE MANAGE AND DISPOSE OF SAID PROPERTY PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 689.071 is a litigant

Latest cases where EAGLE PALMS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MTGLQ Investors, LP is a litigant