This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 08/09/2019 at 11:03:28 (UTC).

MTGLQ INVESTORS LP vs BALLINGER, SAMUEL

Case Summary

On 01/30/2019 MTGLQ INVESTORS LP filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BALLINGER, SAMUEL. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Huey, L. Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1116

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Huey, L. Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MTGLQ INVESTORS LP

12425 28Th St North, Ste. 200

St. Petersburg, FL 33716

Defendants

CHASE BANK USA NA

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

BALLINGER, SAMUEL

Lutz, FL 33548

SUNTRUST EQUIPMENT FINANCE AND LEASING CORP

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301-2525

PUTNAM LEASING COMPANY I LLC

500 West Putnam Avenue 4Th Floor

Greenwich, CT 06830

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SAMUEL BALLINGER

Lutz, FL 33548

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Lutz, FL 33548

RICHARD L BROWN AND COMPANY

609 W Azeele Street

Tampa, FL 33606

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

WACKER, DAVID A

Largo, FL 33777

HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY

Tampa, FL 33602

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB

777 American Express Way

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33337

FAIRCLOTH ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

15928 Dover Cliffe Drive

Lutz, FL 33548

SICO INC DBA AVILA GOLF & COUNTRY CLUB

509 Gusiando De Avila

Tampa, FL 33613

THONOTOSASSA SUPPLY INC

10441 Harney Road

Thonotosassa, FL 33592

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Lutz, FL 33548

THE BANK OF TAMPA

4503 Woodland Corporate Blvd Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33614

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLENDENING , CARLY MARIE

Attorney at EXL LEGAL, PLLC

12425 28Th St N Ste 200

St Petersburg, FL 33716

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

07/30/2019: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION

04/05/2019: PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION

ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

04/05/2019: ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

NOTICE OF FILING

04/10/2019: NOTICE OF FILING

COPY OF NOTICE OF ACTION AND PLEADINGS MAILED TO

03/25/2019: COPY OF NOTICE OF ACTION AND PLEADINGS MAILED TO

NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED RETURNED TO ATTORNEY

03/22/2019: NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED RETURNED TO ATTORNEY

AFFIDAVIT OF AVOIDANCE

03/20/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF AVOIDANCE

SWORN STATEMENT

03/20/2019: SWORN STATEMENT

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

03/19/2019: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/30/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/30/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/30/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/30/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/30/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/30/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/30/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/30/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/30/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF; Comment: SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Comment: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE MEDIATION PROGRAM CONTACT INFORMATION FORM AND PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATION FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION; Comment: MEDIATION WILL BE HELD W/IN SIXTY (60) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER OF REFERRAL AS SET FORTH HEREIN RNF 4-2-19; Additional Info: Date Signed: 04/02/2019; Judicial Officer: Judge, Presiding

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COPY OF NOTICE OF ACTION AND PLEADINGS MAILED TO; Comment: SAMUEL BALLINGER A/K/A SAMUEL W. BALLINGER A/K/A SAMUEL WILLIAM BALLINGER 15934 NOTTINGHILL DR LUTZ, FL 33548-6182; Additional Info: Defendant: BALLINGER, SAMUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED RETURNED TO ATTORNEY; Comment: XL LEGAL, PLLC 12425 28TH ST., NORTH, SUITE 200 ST PETERSBURG, FL 33716; Additional Info: Date 2: 05/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF AVOIDANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SWORN STATEMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: BALLINGER, SAMUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS LP

    Read MoreRead Less