Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 04/20/2021 at 16:59:19 (UTC).

MTD Marketing LLC vs 24/7 Laboratories LLC

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 MTD Marketing LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 24/7 Laboratories LLC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Moody, James. S and Moody, S. James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2227

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Moody, James. S

Moody, S. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MTD Marketing LLC

2111 W. Swann Avenue

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant

24/7 Laboratories LLC

6107 Memorial Highway Suite F

Tampa, FL 33615

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERREIRO , NICOLAS

Attorney at MANDELBAUM, FITZSIMMONS, HEWITT & CAIN

2111 W Swann Ave Ste 200

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

FOX , BRITTANY MARIE

Attorney at EDISON, EDISON, & BRANDT, PLLC

11268 Winthrop Main St

Riverview, FL 33578

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

03/18/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

03/08/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

03/05/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/05/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/05/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/05/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: 24/7 Laboratories LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: 24/7 Laboratories LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 24/7 LABORATORIES LLC 03/12/2021; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTD Marketing LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: 24/7 Laboratories LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTD Marketing LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTD Marketing LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTD Marketing LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MTD Marketing LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ferreiro, Nicholas A.