This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/01/2022 at 04:41:25 (UTC).

M&T Bank vs Padilla, Cecelia M

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 M T Bank filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Padilla, Cecelia M. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Battles, L. Emmett and Battles, Emmett. L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4614

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Battles, L. Emmett

Battles, Emmett. L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M&T Bank

C/O Tiffany & Bosco, P.A. 1201 S. Orlando Avenue, Suite 430

Winter Park, FL 32789

Defendants

Copper Ridge Brandon Homeowners Association Inc

C/O Kevin Fenton, Registered Agent 1111 Avenida Del Circo Suite B

Venice, FL 34285

Padilla, Cecelia M

Valrico, FL 33594

Possession 1, Unknown Party in

Valrico, FL 33594

Possession 2, Unknown Party in

Valrico, FL 33594

Taitt, Harold Augustus, Jr

Valrico, FL 33594

United States of America

Tampa, FL 33602

Copper Ridge/Brandon Homeowners' Association, Inc.

C/O Kevin Fenton, Registered Agent 1111 Avenida Del Circo Suite B

Venice, FL 34285

Unknown Party Possession 1

Valrico, FL 33594

Unknown Party Possession 2

Valrico, FL 33594

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH , ANTHONY RYAN

Attorney at TIFFANY & BOSCO, P.A.

1201 S Orlando Ave Ste 430

Winter Park, FL 32789

 

Court Documents

ANSWER

06/23/2022: ANSWER

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

06/17/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

06/17/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

06/17/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

06/17/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

06/02/2022: Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

06/02/2022: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/02/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/02/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

LIS PENDENS

06/01/2022: LIS PENDENS

VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

06/01/2022: VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/01/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/01/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

06/01/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/01/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/01/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/01/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/01/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: United States of America

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: DEFT: CECELIA M. PADILLA A/K/A CECELIA M. TAITT- 6/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: DEFT: HAROLD AUGUSTUS TAITT JR. A/K/A HAROLD AUGUSTUS TAITT, JR.- 6/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: DEFT: UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: DEFT: UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Additional Info: Defendant: Copper Ridge/Brandon Homeowners' Association, Inc.; Defendant: Padilla, Cecelia M; Defendant: Taitt, Harold Augustus, Jr; Defendant: United States of America; Defendant: Unknown Party Possession 1; Defendant: Unknown Party Possession 2; Plaintiff: M&T Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x6; Additional Info: Defendant: Copper Ridge/Brandon Homeowners' Association, Inc.; Defendant: Padilla, Cecelia M; Defendant: Taitt, Harold Augustus, Jr; Defendant: United States of America; Defendant: Unknown Party Possession 1; Defendant: Unknown Party Possession 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x6

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: M&T Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: M&T Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: M&T Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: M&T Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: M&T Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: M&T Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: M&T Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: M&T Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: M&T Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: M&T Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Copper Ridge/Brandon Homeowner`s Association, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where M&T BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, ANTHONY R. ESQ