This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 08/11/2022 at 15:56:21 (UTC).

MRI Associates Of Tampa, Inc,MONTERO, REBECCA vs Cannon Cochran Management Service, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 MRI Associates Of Tampa, Inc,MONTERO, REBECCA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Cannon Cochran Management Service, Inc. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Ober, Ann. Joelle and Schultz-Kin, Leslie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5318

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Ober, Ann. Joelle

Schultz-Kin, Leslie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MONTERO, REBECCA

MRI Associates Of Tampa, Inc

PARK PLACE MRI

Defendant

Cannon Cochran Management Service, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ORRICK , JOHN V, Jr

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/30/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/30/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/07/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

04/30/2021: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/30/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/30/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/30/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT

12/10/2021: DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

01/26/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022057644; Judge: Schultz-Kin, Leslie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI Associates Of Tampa, Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT; Additional Info: Defendant: Cannon Cochran Management Service, Inc.; Plaintiff: MONTERO, REBECCA; Plaintiff: MRI Associates Of Tampa, Inc; Date Signed: 12/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Cannon Cochran Management Service, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI Associates Of Tampa, Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI Associates Of Tampa, Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI Associates Of Tampa, Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI Associates Of Tampa, Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI Associates Of Tampa, Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI Associates Of Tampa, Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI Associates Of Tampa, Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less