Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/20/2021 at 17:09:54 (UTC).

Mri Associates Of Tampa, Inc.,Rodriguez, Gianko vs Progressive Northern Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 Mri Associates Of Tampa, Inc ,Rodriguez, Gianko filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Progressive Northern Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6477

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mri Associates Of Tampa, nc., D/B/A Park Place Mri A/A/O Gianko Rodriguez,

6946 West Linebaugh Ave

Tampa, FL 33626

Mri Associates Of Tampa, Inc.

6946 West Linebaugh Ave

Tampa, FL 33626

PARK PLACE MRI

Rodriguez, Gianko

Defendant

Progressive Northern Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ORRICK , JOHN V, Jr

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN V. ORRICK, P.L.

6946 W Linebaugh Ave

Tampa, FL 33625

 

Court Documents

E-FILED ALIAS 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/14/2021: E-FILED ALIAS 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/16/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

06/16/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/10/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/10/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED ALIAS 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Northern Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED; Comment: PROGRESSIVE NORTHERNINSURANCE COMPANY; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Northern Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Northern Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Northern Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Northern Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Tampa, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Tampa, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Tampa, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Tampa, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Tampa, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Tampa, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Tampa, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST PETE INC AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR JAVITZ, RUSSELL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ORRICK , JOHN V, Jr